Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04079
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:May 26, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Efficient Hauling Services, LLC, Defendant
27480 Wick Rd.
Romulus, MI 48174
Represented By
Efficient Hauling Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/26 12:16 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Certificate of Service Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 05/26 12:40 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4079 : Settled. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/26 12:41 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4079 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
13 13 court Copy of Fri 05/22 2:39 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Debtor To Compromise Claims and Approving Settlement And Release Agreement With Efficient Hauling Services, LLC (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/23 11:18 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding, Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 04/17 7:50 AM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Re: Entry of Order Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
10 10 court Copy of Thu 03/19 11:11 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/04 5:00 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Efficient Hauling Services, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] snick, H.
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/04 4:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Efficient Hauling Services, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] snick, H.
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/04 12:58 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC Related [+]. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulated Order
6 6 order stipulated order Wed 03/04 10:16 AM
Order Extending Deadline To Answer Complaint. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 03/04 9:11 AM
Stipulation By and Between the Plaintiff and the Defendant Re: Entry of Order Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 02/21 3:21 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 12:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Efficient Hauling Services, LLC 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 12:12 PM
Summons Issued on Efficient Hauling Services, LLC Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 12:12 PM
Adversary case 20-04079 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against Efficient Hauling Services, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]