Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04081
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:Mar 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
MDK Zero Landfill, Defendant
PO Box 263 625 Klenske Ave.
New Hampton, IA 50659
Represented By
MDK Zero Landfill
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/03 2:02 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Proof of Service Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/03 9:46 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant MDK Zero Landfill. (Kaminski, Shanna)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 03/03 2:33 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4081 : Dismissed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/03 2:34 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4081 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 12:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on MDK Zero Landfill 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 12:38 PM
Summons Issued on MDK Zero Landfill Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 12:38 PM
Adversary case 20-04081 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against MDK Zero Landfill. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]