Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04082
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:Jul 30, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
PSC Metals, Inc., Defendant
601 Abbot Rd.
East Lansing, MI 48823
Represented By
PSC Metals, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, July 30, 2020
18 18 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Thu 07/30 11:27 AM
Order Dismissing This Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
17 17 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 07/30 10:58 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Rivore Metals, LLC (Plaintiff) and PSC Metals, LLC (Defendant) and proposed order. . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 07/30 11:27 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4082 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/30 11:29 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4082 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
16 16 answer Response Tue 07/07 11:14 AM
Response to Related [+] and Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-] 14 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal of Case
15 15 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/07 11:08 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
14 14 order Show Cause for Dismissal of Case Mon 07/06 11:44 AM
Order Requiring Plaintiff To Show Cause, In Writing, Why This Adversary Proceeding Should Not Be Dismissed, For Lack Of Prosecution. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
13 13 court Copy of Wed 06/10 5:13 PM
Copy of: Case Management Order Applicable To All Pending Preference Actions (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/20 6:34 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant PSC Metals, LLC Related [+]. (Swanson, Marc)
Related: [-] 9 Statement of Corporate Ownership,11 Deficiency Notice
Monday, May 18, 2020
11 11 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Mon 05/18 11:40 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 5/26/2020. (kcm)
Related: [-] 9 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Defendant PSC Metals, LLC
Friday, May 15, 2020
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/15 9:36 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by PSC Metals, LLC. (Swanson, Marc)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 05/15 9:33 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Corporate parents added to case: Icahn Enterprises L.P.. Filed by Defendant PSC Metals, LLC. (Swanson, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
8 8 order Substituting Party Tue 04/14 4:42 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Debtor Rivore Metals, LLC And PSC Metals, LLC For Entry Of An Order (I) Substituting PSC Metals, LLC As Defendant; (II) Adjusting Case Caption; And (III) Extending Deadline For PSC Metals, LLC To Answer Or Otherwise Respond. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Defendant PSC Metals, Inc.
7 7 misc Stipulation Tue 04/14 3:11 PM
Stipulation By and Between PSC Metals, LLC and Rivore Metals, LLC Re: Substitution of defendant and extension of time to respond to complaint . Filed by Defendant PSC Metals, Inc.. (Spinner, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
6 6 court Copy of Thu 03/19 11:18 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
5 5 order stipulated order Wed 03/11 9:21 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Extending Response Deadline Of PSC Metals, Inc Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation filed by Defendant PSC Metals, Inc.
4 4 misc Stipulation Tue 03/10 4:21 PM
Stipulation By and Between PSC Metals, Inc and Rivore Metals, LLC Re: Extending Response Deadline of PSC Metals, Inc. Stipulation Extending Response Deadline of PSC Metals, Inc. . Filed by Defendant PSC Metals, Inc.. (Swanson, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 12:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on PSC Metals, Inc. 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 12:46 PM
Summons Issued on PSC Metals, Inc. Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 12:46 PM
Adversary case 20-04082 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against PSC Metals, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]