Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04083
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:Jun 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Real Alloy Recycling, Defendant
601 Abbot Rd.
East Lansing, MI 48823
Represented By
Real Alloy Recycling
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/10 2:48 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Certificate of Service Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 06/10 3:12 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4083 : Dismissed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/10 3:13 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4083 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
10 10 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Fri 05/15 5:01 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 04/17 7:52 AM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Re: Entry of Order Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
8 8 court Copy of Thu 03/19 11:21 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/03 1:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC Related [+]. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulated Order
6 6 order stipulated order Tue 03/03 9:40 AM
Order Extending Deadline To Answer Complaint. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC
Monday, March 02, 2020
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 03/02 1:31 PM
Stipulation By and Between the Plaintiff and the Defendant Re: Entry of Order Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 02/21 3:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Bedigian, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 1:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on Real Alloy Recycling 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 12:59 PM
Summons Issued on Real Alloy Recycling Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 12:59 PM
Adversary case 20-04083 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against Real Alloy Recycling. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]