Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04086
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:May 21, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wallach Iron and Metal Co., Inc.
6670 Dr. Martin Luther Dr.
St. Louis, MO 63133
Represented By
Wallach Iron and Metal Co., Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, May 21, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/21 8:37 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4086 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/20 4:24 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Certificate of Service Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 05/21 8:36 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4086 : Dismissed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
8 8 court Copy of Fri 05/15 3:46 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Debtor To Compromise Claims And Approving Settlement And Release Agreement With Wallach Iron And Metal Co., Inc. (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
7 7 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/26 1:42 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
6 6 court Copy of Thu 03/19 11:23 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) Re:4 Clerk's Entry Of Default (kcm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 15, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/16 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, March 13, 2020
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 03/13 2:05 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Wallach Iron and Metal Co., Inc. Default Judgment Motion due by 3/27/2020. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 1:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on Wallach Iron and Metal Co., Inc. 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 1:31 PM
Summons Issued on Wallach Iron and Metal Co., Inc. Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 1:31 PM
Adversary case 20-04086 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against Wallach Iron and Metal Co., Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]