Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04087
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:Oct 14, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Zeeland Freight Services, Inc.
601 Abbot Rd.
East Lansing, MI 48823
Represented By
Zeeland Freight Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
court Minute Entry. Case Closed Tue 03/09 10:36 AM
Minute Entry. Case Closed. Related [+] (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Monday, February 08, 2021
court Minute Entry. Matter Settled Mon 02/08 11:29 AM
Minute Entry. Matter Settled. Related [+] (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
21 21 misc Mediator's Certification Pursuant to L.B.R. 7016-2(a)(7) Tue 12/08 2:17 PM
Mediator's Certification Pursuant to L.B.R. 7016-2(a)(7) was not conducted, because the parties settled prior to the mediation Filed by Mediator Jason W Bank Related [+]. (Bank, Jason)
Related: [-] 17 Order for Mediation
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
20 20 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Wed 10/14 3:28 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation
19 19 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/14 3:00 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff, Rivore Metals, L.L.C., by and through its counsel, Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C. and Zeeland Freight Services, Inc. by and through its counsel, Warner Norcross and Judd, LLP and proposed order. . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 10/14 3:28 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4087 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/14 3:30 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4087 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/08 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 08/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order for Mediation
Thursday, August 06, 2020
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Thu 08/06 11:56 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 8/6/2020 by the United States Postal Service to Jason W. Bank at 500 Woodward Ave., Suite 2500, Detroit, MI 48226. Related [+] (sms)
Related: [-] 17 Order for Mediation
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
17 17 order Mediation Wed 08/05 4:41 PM
Order Appointing Mediator, Jason W Bank is appointed as Mediato Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation for Mediation filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC
Monday, August 03, 2020
16 16 motion Stipulation for Mediation Mon 08/03 2:08 PM
Stipulation for Mediation By and Between Rivore Metals, LLC and Zeeland Freight Services, Inc. . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/17 3:51 PM
Certificate of Service for Defendant Zeeland Freight Services, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 26(a)(1) Filed by Defendant Zeeland Freight Services, Inc.. (Rucker, Emily)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Fri 07/17 3:51 PM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC Related [+]. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 12 Report Parties Rule 26(f) Conference
Thursday, July 02, 2020
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/06 8:50 AM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order -Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 2/8/2021 at 10:00AM at Courtroom 1925. Trial date set for 3/9/2021 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 1925. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
12 12 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Tue 06/23 12:53 PM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
11 11 court Copy of Wed 06/10 5:13 PM
Copy of: Case Management Order Applicable To All Pending Preference Actions (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
10 10 court Copy of Thu 03/19 11:27 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 15, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/16 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Deficiency Notice
Friday, March 13, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/13 11:05 AM
Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Zeeland Freight Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Rucker, Emily)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint
7 7 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Fri 03/13 10:31 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Missing . Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 3/20/2020. (J. Laskaska)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Zeeland Freight Services, Inc.
Thursday, March 12, 2020
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/12 10:08 AM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Zeeland Freight Services, Inc.. (Rucker, Emily)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 03/12 10:06 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Zeeland Freight Services, Inc.. (Rucker, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/11 2:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Zeeland Freight Services, Inc.. (Von Eitzen, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/11 1:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Zeeland Freight Services, Inc. 2/11/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 1:40 PM
Summons Issued on Zeeland Freight Services, Inc. Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 1:39 PM
Adversary case 20-04087 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against Zeeland Freight Services, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]