Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04092
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2020
Terminated:Mar 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Total Scrap Management
Represented By
Total Scrap Management
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
4 4 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/03 10:55 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 3 Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 03/03 10:56 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4092 : Dismissed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/03 10:57 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4092 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Tue 03/03 10:58 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 3/3/20 by the United States Postal Service to Total Scrap Management, C/o Marty Pathak, Owner, 4250 North Service Rd E, Windsor, ON N8W 5X2 . Related [+] (kcm)
Related: [-] 4 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Monday, February 24, 2020
3 3 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Mon 02/24 8:53 AM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Total Scrap Management. Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 3/2/2020. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/11 4:09 PM
Summons Issued on Total Scrap Management Answer Due 03/12/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/11 4:09 PM
Adversary case 20-04092 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against Total Scrap Management. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]