Original Case: 3:15-cv-00785

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-00489
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2020
Terminated:Nov 15, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 16, 2021 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Thomas Ward
Defendant
Joseph Elmlinger
Defendant
Foundation Capital Partners LLC, FKA Foundation Managing Member LLC
Defendant - Appellee
Foundation Capital Partners LLC, FKA Foundation Managing Member LLC
Represented By
Joseph Michael Pastore III
Pastore & Dailey LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dean Barr
Represented By
Joseph Michael Pastore III
Pastore & Dailey LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph Meehan
Represented By
Jonathan Paul Whitcomb
Diserio Martin O'Connor & Castiglioni LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
FIH, LLC
Represented By
Samuel J. Lieberman
Sadis & Goldberg, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/16/2021 3:27 AM EST
Monday, February 10, 2020
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant FIH, LLC, FILED. [2774766] [20-489] [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:52 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 29 pgs Case FILED
2 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/09/2020, RECEIVED.[2774784] [20-489] [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:56 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant FIH, LLC, district court receipt # ACTDC-5685743, FILED.[2774794] [20-489] [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:58 AM]
Related: [-]