Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50456
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2020
Terminated:Sep 30, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jrs Ventures Inc, Cwe/Jrs
37 Elaine Dr.
O'fallon, MO 63366
Represented By
Jrs Ventures Inc, Cwe/Jrs
contact info
Plaintiff
NSC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
17 17 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 09/30 11:43 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/30 3:23 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50456 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/16 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Service of Summonses and Complaints Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/10 2:25 PM
Certificate of Service of Scheduling Order Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
14 14 6 pgs order Order Fri 09/04 2:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Related [+] Order Signed on 9/4/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 09/04 11:22 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 09/02 1:04 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Edward P. Bond. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 08/31 1:42 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Edward P. Bond. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 08/31 11:20 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Edward P. Bond. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
9 9 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Fri 07/10 11:23 AM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference Hearing and Proposed Form of Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/19 1:48 PM
Certificate of Service Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 24, 2020 at 2:00 PM Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Thu 06/18 5:12 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Cohen, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
6 6 notice Hearing - Notice Fri 05/29 3:00 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Pre-trial Conference Hearing and Proposed Form of Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
5 5 misc Status Report Tue 05/26 2:25 PM
Status Report in Preference Adversary Proceedings Pending Before The Honorable Christopher S. Sontchi Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/30 3:37 PM
First Amended Complaint to Modify Party Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust Related [+] AP Summons Served due date: 6/28/2020. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, March 20, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 03/20 10:18 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Jrs Ventures Inc, Cwe/Jrs. Pretrial Conference date to be determined. Related [+] Tickle due by: 5/19/2020. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-] ument1
Thursday, February 13, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/13 1:16 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50456 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9643381, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 02/13 11:06 AM
Adversary case 20-50456 Complaint by NSC Liquidating Trust against Jrs Ventures Inc, Cwe/Jrs. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/13/2020. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives