Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:18-bk-12394
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Jul 16, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
NSC Wholesale Holdings LLC
111 Hempstead Tpke
West Hempstead, NY 11552-2155
Represented By
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

GPO Feb 09 2022
Opinion (CAS)

Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1040 1040 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/30 9:41 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Earle, Katharina)
Related: [-]
1039 1039 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/30 9:39 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Earle, Katharina)
Related: [-]