NSC Liquidating Trust v. Minhas Furniture House Ltd
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50472 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 30, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Minhas Furniture House Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NSC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 12/30 9:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50472 Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.) |
|
27 | 27
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Default Judgment Against Defendant Minhas Furniture House Ltd. Signed on 12/15/2020. (DMC) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Minhas Furniture House Ltd. Signed on 12/15/2020. (DMC) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Status Report as of December 10, 2020 Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Certificate of Service for Amended Request for Entry of Default and Amended Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Amended Exhibit(s) Request for Entry of Judgment Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Amended Exhibit(s) Request for Entry of Default Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Amended Certificate of Service Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Amended Certificate of Service Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() Request for Entry of Default Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Status Report in Preference Adversary Proceedings Pending Before the Honorable Christopher S. Sontchi Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Service of Summonses and Complaints Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certificate of Service of Scheduling Order Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER Order Signed on 9/4/2020. (CAS) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Edward P. Bond. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Edward P. Bond. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Edward P. Bond. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference Hearing and Proposed Form of Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 24, 2020 at 2:00 PM Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Edward P. Bond. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Hearing Notice of Pre-trial Conference Hearing and Proposed Form of Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Status Report in Preference Adversary Proceedings Pending Before The Honorable Christopher S. Sontchi Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Minhas Furniture House Ltd. Pretrial Conference date to be determined. Tickle due by: 5/19/2020. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 02/13 1:16 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50472 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9643381, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50472 Complaint by NSC Liquidating Trust against Minhas Furniture House Ltd. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/13/2020. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |