Hopson v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:18-md-02859
Lead case: 1:18-md-02859
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Crotty |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-01239 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 12, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 10, 2020 4:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Zimmer US, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Zimmer, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Tanya Hopson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 4:11 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that no later than April 25, 2024, the parties shall file on ECF a joint letter, described below, updating the Court on the status of the case. The joint letter shall not exceed eight pages and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs: 1. A list of all member cases that remain to be litigated ("Live Cases"); 2. Whether any case other than the Live Cases that remains open can be closed (administratively or otherwise), specifically addressing the status of Sullens, which is open but has had no docket activity since July 13, 2022; 3. The status of the Master Settlement Agreement ("MSA"), including but not limited to the timing and process for dismissal of any not-yet-dismissed cases that are part of the MSA and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/12/24) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-JMF et al. (yv) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 07/14 2:23 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:17-cv-02119-PAC; granting (583) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:18-md-02859-PAC. ENDORSEMENT: Permission to withdraw is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/13/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al. (ate) |
|
Tuesday, October 19, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Tue 10/19 6:29 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/7/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(Moya, Goretti) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Transcript
Tue 10/19 6:22 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/7/2021 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(Moya, Goretti) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Thu 07/22 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/14/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Transcript
Thu 07/22 11:47 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/14/2021 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/08 1:32 PM
ORDER NO. 61: Zimmer asks the Court to limit Plaintiff Nutting's affirmative deposition designations to 15 hours' worth of testimony, arguing that Plaintiffs current designations (which Zimmer estimates at 50 hours' worth) are over broad in light of the Court's order that each side will have five trial days (approximately 25-30 hours) for direct and cross examination. Defs.' Mot. Limit Pl.'s Dep. Designations 1 & n.1, 2, ECF No. 439.1 Plaintiff responds that these designations are all necessary, and that Zimmer's motion is premature-Plaintiff argues that the Court should not limit her designations until after the parties have winnowed them down through the objection and counter-designation process. Pl.'s Resp. to Defs.' Mot. Limit Pl.'s Dep. Designations 1-3, ECF No. 446. The Court will not limit the parties' designations at this time, but the parties are reminded that each side will have only five days in which to present its respective case-in-chief, and the Court will enforce those time limits. See In re Gen. Motors LLC Ignition Switch Litig., Nos. 14-MD-2543, 14-MC-2543, 2016 WL 4493863, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Aug. 24, 2016). Accordingly, Zimmer's motion is denied. (As further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/8/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al. (va) |
|
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Transcript
Fri 06/04 4:47 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 5/13/2021 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/25/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Wed 06/02 3:28 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), it is hereby stipulated and agreed that Plaintiff, Tanya Hopson dismisses all claims asserted in this litigation against Defendants, Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer Biornet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. (As further set forth herein.) So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/2/2021) (va) |
|
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 04/27 3:46 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (25 in 1:20-cv-01167-PAC, 21 in 1:20-cv-02986-PAC, 29 in 1:19-cv-09112-PAC, 59 in 1:19-cv-00141-PAC, 359 in 1:18-md-02859-PAC, 25 in 1:20-cv-01162-PAC, 29 in 1:19-cv-06695-PAC, 56 in 1:19-cv-00310-PAC, 27 in 1:19-cv-08110-PAC, 30 in 1:19-cv-08360-PAC, 30 in 1:19-cv-08356-PAC, 38 in 1:19-cv-02486-PAC, 39 in 1:19-cv-02646-PAC, 25 in 1:20-cv-00921-PAC, 29 in 1:19-cv-08766-PAC, 29 in 1:19-cv-06692-PAC, 31 in 1:19-cv-04651-PAC) MOTION for Basil E. Adham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-24459104. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al.(wb) |
||
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Tue 04/13 8:56 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/31/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Transcript
Tue 04/13 8:52 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/31/2021 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Wed 02/10 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/1/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Transcript
Wed 02/10 4:34 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/1/2021 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Wed 01/27 12:41 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/15/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Transcript
Wed 01/27 12:35 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/15/2020 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Tue 08/11 5:58 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/5/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Transcript
Tue 08/11 5:52 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/5/2020 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/16 2:08 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Tanya Hopson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Nigh, Daniel) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/16 2:24 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 14 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Crotty for approval for the following reason(s): Second Paragraph. (dt) |
||
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/15 11:01 AM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. Document filed by Tanya Hopson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Nigh, Daniel) Modified on 7/15/2020 (km) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
Wed 07/15 11:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Daniel Nigh to RE-FILE Document 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type Other Filings, Other Documents, Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The stipulation needs to have handwritten signatures of the attorneys. (km) |
||
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Thu 06/18 7:37 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/5/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Transcript
Thu 06/18 7:32 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 6/5/2020 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Smith, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2020.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Tue 02/18 11:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc. served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020; Zimmer US, Inc. served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020; Zimmer, Inc. served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Service was accepted by Faegre Baker Daniels, Lead Counsel. Document filed by Tanya Hopson..(Nigh, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/13 2:52 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc...(pc) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/13 2:51 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc...(pc) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/13 2:50 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc...(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 02/13 10:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 02/13 10:13 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Thu 02/13 10:13 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18md2859. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 02/13 3:08 PM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (ad) |
||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Thu 02/13 3:09 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Thu 02/13 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) |
||
utility
Case Consolidation - MDL
Fri 02/14 8:12 AM
CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo) |
||
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Tanya Hopson..(Nigh, Daniel) | |
5 | 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Tanya Hopson..(Nigh, Daniel) | |
4 | 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Tanya Hopson..(Nigh, Daniel) | |
3 | 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-md-2859. Document filed by Tanya Hopson..(Nigh, Daniel) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nigh, Daniel) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18778929)Document filed by Tanya Hopson..(Nigh, Daniel) |