Member Case
Lead case is: 3:20-bk-30805

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-bk-30806
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2020
Terminated:Nov 17, 2020

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pier 1 Assets, Inc.
100 Pier 1 Pl
Fort Worth, TX 76102-2600
Represented By
Michael A. Condyles
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
10 10 court Case Closed - Chapter 11 Wed 11/18 11:21 AM
Case Closed. The Chapter 11 case having been fully administered, the case is hereby closed. (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
9 9 claims Verification of Claims Register Upon Expiration of Claims Deadline Tue 08/25 10:59 AM
Verification of Claims Register Upon Expiration of Claims Deadline (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
8 8 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Tue 03/17 12:01 AM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists (Statement of Financial Affairs) filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Assets, Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
7 7 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Tue 03/17 12:00 AM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Assets, Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
6 6 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Joint Administration Tue 02/18 3:01 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration Related [+]. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the FederalRules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local BankruptcyRules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District ofVirginia directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of thechapter 11 cases of: Pier 1 Imports, Inc., Case No. 20-30805 Pier 1 Assets,Inc., Case No. 20-30806 Pier 1 Holdings, Inc., Case No. 20-30807 Pier 1Imports (U.S.), Inc., Case No. 20-30808 Pier 1 Licensing, Inc., CaseNo. 20-30809 Pier 1 Services Company, Case No. 20-30810 PIR Trading,Inc., Case No. 20-30811 Pier 1 Value Services, LLC, Case No. 20-30804 The docket in Case No. 20-30805 should be consulted for all mattersaffecting these cases. (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] 3
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance (Attorney Users Only) Tue 02/18 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Joseph H. Lemkin of Stark & Stark, P.C. on behalf of Levin Management Corporation.(Lemkin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance (Attorney Users Only) Tue 02/18 11:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Thomas S Onder of Stark & Stark, P.C. on behalf of Levin Management Corporation.(Onder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2020
3 3 16 pgs motion Joint Administration Mon 02/17 12:36 PM
Motion for Joint Administration with 20-30804 20-30805 20-30807 20-30808 20-30809 20-30810 20-30811 Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Assets, Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 02/17 11:16 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 20-30806 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 32045376, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 28 pgs misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Mon 02/17 10:59 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Assets, Inc.. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]