Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-bk-30805
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2020
Terminated:Jan 21, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pier 1 Imports, Inc.
100 Pier 1 Pl
Fort Worth, TX 76102-2600
Represented By
Michael A. Condyles
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219

Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Sunday, January 26, 2025
1864 1864 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 01/27 12:19 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)1861 Final Decree
Friday, January 24, 2025
1863 1863 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/24 2:27 PM
Certificate of Service - [Docket No. 1861] Related [+] filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Imports, Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1861 Final Decree
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
1862 1862 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 01/21 5:18 PM
Eighth Order Extending the Claims Objection Bar Date Related [+] (Palacios, Lilian)
Related: [-] 1850
1861 1861 order Final Decree Tue 01/21 3:52 PM
Final Decree, the Final Report of the Debtor is approved, the Motion for Final Decree is granted, and the case is hereby closed. Related [+] (Palacios, Lilian)
Related: [-] related document(s)1855 Final Report and Motion for Final Decree filed by Pier 1 Imports, Inc., Motion to Approve
1860 1860 court Hearing held; motion granted Tue 01/21 11:43 AM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED Related [+] Appearances: Jeremy S. Williams; Kathryn Montgomery (RachelGreenleaf)
Related: [-] 1855 Final Report and Motion for Final Decree filed by Pier 1 Imports, Inc.