Member Case
Lead case is: 3:20-bk-30805

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-bk-30808
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2020
Terminated:Nov 17, 2020

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc.
100 Pier 1 Pl
Fort Worth, TX 76102-2600
Represented By
Michael A. Condyles
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
19 19 court Case Closed - Chapter 11 Wed 11/18 11:22 AM
Case Closed. The Chapter 11 case having been fully administered, the case is hereby closed. (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
18 18 misc Request for Notice/Service Fri 09/18 8:29 AM
Request for Notice/Service filed by Chatham County Tax Commissioner. (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
17 17 claims Verification of Claims Register Upon Expiration of Claims Deadline Tue 08/25 10:17 AM
Verification of Claims Register Upon Expiration of Claims Deadline (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
16 16 notice CerDocTyp - Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Fri 07/31 12:24 AM
Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 15 Inquiry/General Checksheet
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
15 15 court 4 - Inquiry/General Checksheet Request Tue 07/28 9:00 AM
Inquiry/General Checksheet Issued to Shraddha Bharatia regarding Request for Notice/Service filed in Associated Case. Related [+] (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Request for Notice/Service filed by American Express Travel Related Services Co, Inc
Monday, July 20, 2020
14 14 misc Request for Notice/Service (Claimant Users Only) Mon 07/20 11:43 AM
Request for Notice/Service filed by American Express Travel Related Services Co, Inc.(Bharatia, Shraddha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
13 13 notice CerDocTyp - Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Thu 04/02 12:25 AM
Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 12 Inquiry/General Checksheet
Monday, March 30, 2020
12 12 court 4 - Inquiry/General Checksheet Request Mon 03/30 5:08 PM
Inquiry/General Checksheet Issued to Albemarle County Dept. of Finance Claim No. 3; Not accompained by Proof of Claim and not filed in Lead Case 20-30805 (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
11 11 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Tue 03/17 12:17 AM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists (Statement of Financial Affairs) filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Tue 03/17 12:15 AM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/13 10:27 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Steven F. Jackson of Office of the Loudoun County Attorney on behalf of County of Loudoun. (Jackson, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/04 4:41 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jason A. Starks of Office of the Attorney General of Texas on behalf of Travis County. (Starks, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance (Attorney Users Only) Thu 02/27 11:36 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jeff P. Prostok of Forshey and Prostok, LLP on behalf of Conti Edgecliff-Sias, LLC.(Prostok, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
6 6 misc Amended Voluntary Petition Mon 02/24 6:43 PM
Amended Voluntary Petition filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 2:18 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by John M. Koneck of Fedrikson & Byron, P.A. on behalf of AEI National Income Property Fund VII LP. (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
4 4 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Joint Administration Tue 02/18 3:03 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration Related [+]. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the FederalRules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local BankruptcyRules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District ofVirginia directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of thechapter 11 cases of: Pier 1 Imports, Inc., Case No. 20-30805 Pier 1 Assets,Inc., Case No. 20-30806 Pier 1 Holdings, Inc., Case No. 20-30807 Pier 1Imports (U.S.), Inc., Case No. 20-30808 Pier 1 Licensing, Inc., CaseNo. 20-30809 Pier 1 Services Company, Case No. 20-30810 PIR Trading,Inc., Case No. 20-30811 Pier 1 Value Services, LLC, Case No. 20-30804 The docket in Case No. 20-30805 should be consulted for all mattersaffecting these cases. (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, February 17, 2020
3 3 motion Joint Administration Mon 02/17 12:38 PM
Motion for Joint Administration with 20-30804 20-30805 20-30806 20-30807 20-30809 20-30810 20-30811 Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc.. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 02/17 11:16 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 20-30808 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 32045376, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 28 pgs misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Mon 02/17 11:06 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc.. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]