Sizmek DSP, Inc. et al v. Zeta Global Holdings Corp.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01015 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Zeta Global Holdings Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
X Plus Two Solutions, LLC
401 Park Avenue, South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
X Plus One Solutions, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wireless Artist LLC
401 Park Avenue South, 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WirelessDeveloper, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Friday, April 15, 2022 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 04/15 12:20 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1015 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
56 | 56
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/14 1:15 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Neal F. Kronley on behalf of Zeta Global Holdings Corp.. (Kronley, Neal) |