Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. 1Life Healthcare, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01017 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
1Life Healthcare, Inc.
130 Sutter Street
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 08/02 3:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1017 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Mon 09/28 12:06 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
order
Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only
Thu 09/24 3:02 PM
Order Signed On 9/24/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Approving Settlements Of Avoidance Actions Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 07/13 12:47 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/19 3:16 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 06/19 3:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for June 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Motion, Approve
Thu 04/23 7:35 AM
Order Signed On 3/26/2020 Re: On Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code . (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 03/23 2:01 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/05 4:16 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc. Responses due by 3/19/2020,. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mediator List | ||
Att: 4 Notice | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/25 2:52 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 02/24 3:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01017 smb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13789194. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 02/19 9:00 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 3/20/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 02/18 12:56 PM
Adversary case 20-01017 Complaint against 1Life Healthcare, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |