Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Address Srl
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01018 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Address Srl
Via Mario Pagano, 48
Milano, MI 20145 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 07/19 2:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1018 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson.(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for March 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Amended Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Address Srl . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Mon 03/08 8:39 AM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Address Srl . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for June 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Signed On 3/26/2020 Re: On Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code . (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc. Responses due by 3/19/2020,. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 02/24 3:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01018 smb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13789194. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-01018 Complaint against Address Srl (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |