Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Consulting Maine, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01025 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Consulting Maine, LLC
1 Cardinal Lane
Cape Elizabeth, ME 04107 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 08/02 3:58 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1025 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 09/28 7:26 AM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 9/28/2020. Re: Voluntary Dismissal Of Adversary Proceeding (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/25 3:46 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only
Thu 09/24 3:02 PM
Order Signed On 9/24/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Approving Settlements Of Avoidance Actions Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/19 5:28 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Jacob A. Manheimer on behalf of Consulting Maine, LLC. (Manheimer, Jacob) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 06/19 5:27 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Jacob A. Manheimer on behalf of Consulting Maine, LLC. (Manheimer, Jacob) |
|
10 | 10
answer
None
Fri 06/19 5:15 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Jacob A. Manheimer on behalf of Consulting Maine, LLC. (Manheimer, Jacob) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/19 3:20 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 06/19 3:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for June 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/18 4:38 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Motion, Approve
Thu 04/23 7:47 AM
Order Signed On 3/26/2020 Re: On Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code . (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 03/23 2:27 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/05 4:33 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc. Responses due by 3/19/2020,. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mediator List | ||
Att: 4 Notice | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/25 2:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 02/24 3:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01025 smb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13789194. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 02/19 9:00 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 3/20/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 02/18 1:19 PM
Adversary case 20-01025 Complaint against Consulting Maine, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |