Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-01030
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2020
Terminated:Mar 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Grant Thornton LLP
171 N. Clark Street Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60601
Represented By
Grant Thornton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, March 01, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/01 10:49 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1030 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
14 14 notice Notice, Dismissal Wed 02/24 2:45 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/17 1:54 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
11 11 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/03 12:09 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
9 9 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 06/19 3:24 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 06/19 3:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for June 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
7 7 order Motion, Approve Thu 04/23 8:17 AM
Order Signed On 3/26/2020 Re: On Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code Related [+] . (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, March 23, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Mon 03/23 2:32 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, March 05, 2020
5 5 motion Motion, Approve Thu 03/05 4:53 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc. Responses due by 3/19/2020,. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mediator List
Att: 4 Notice
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
4 4 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 02/25 7:20 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ehret A. Van Horn on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Van Horn, Ehret)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 2:59 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Monday, February 24, 2020
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 02/24 3:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01030 smb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13789194. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 02/19 9:16 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 3/20/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 02/18 1:44 PM
Adversary case 20-01030 Complaint against Grant Thornton LLP (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A