Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Kahuna Media srl
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01034 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Kahuna Media srl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/25 1:18 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1034 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
||
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Thu 11/17 10:30 AM
Judgment signed on 11/17/2022. Judgment entered that the Plaintiff be awarded a default judgment against the Defendant, Kahuna Media srl, in a total judgment of $20,459.06. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 22,0070 (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
order
Motion, Default Judgment
Thu 11/10 5:35 PM
Order for Default Judgment Signed on 11/10/2022. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 11/07 1:12 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Order for Default Judgment | ||
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Mon 09/26 3:23 PM
Amended Notice of Presentment filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 10/25/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Objections due by 10/24/2022,(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Service | ||
21 | 21
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Mon 09/26 12:27 PM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/25/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 10/24/2022, (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment | ||
Att: 3 Certificaiton of Service | ||
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 09/23 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 09/22/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 09/20 11:06 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Kahuna Media srl (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 09/19 3:35 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Affidavit of Service
Wed 06/23 8:59 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/12 11:36 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 03/12 11:08 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for March 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Mon 03/08 11:50 AM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Kahuna Media srl . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Mon 03/08 8:40 AM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/17 1:58 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 02/17 11:20 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Kahuna Media srl . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/03 12:12 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/19 3:26 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 06/19 3:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for June 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
order
Motion, Approve
Thu 04/23 8:25 AM
Order Signed On 3/26/2020 Re: On Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code . (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 03/23 2:34 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/05 5:01 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc. Responses due by 3/19/2020,. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mediator List | ||
Att: 4 Notice | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 02/24 3:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01034 smb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13789194. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 02/18 1:53 PM
Adversary case 20-01034 Complaint against Kahuna Media srl (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |