Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Matrix It Integration & Infrastructures Ltd.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01036 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Matrix It Integration & Infrastructures Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 08/13 1:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 08/13 2:43 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1036 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/12 11:36 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 03/12 11:08 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for March 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Mon 03/08 11:54 AM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Matrix It Integration & Infrastructures Ltd. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Mon 03/08 8:46 AM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/17 1:58 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 02/17 11:51 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Matrix It Integration & Infrastructures Ltd. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/03 12:12 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/19 3:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 06/19 3:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for June 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
order
Motion, Approve
Thu 04/23 8:27 AM
Order Signed On 3/26/2020 Re: On Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code . (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 03/23 2:36 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/05 5:03 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc. Responses due by 3/19/2020,. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mediator List | ||
Att: 4 Notice | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 02/24 3:59 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01036 smb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13789194. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 02/18 2:00 PM
Adversary case 20-01036 Complaint against Matrix It Integration & Infrastructures Ltd. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |