Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. eMarketer Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01050 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
eMarketer Inc.
11 Times Square 14th Floor
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 13, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Satisfaction of Judgment
Tue 09/13 1:00 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 09/10 11:18 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1050 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
||
Sunday, March 14, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Mon 03/15 1:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 03/14/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
PDF Notice
Fri 03/12 2:24 PM
Notice of Default Judgment (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 03/12 2:23 PM
Judgment signed on 3/12/2021. Judgment entered that the Plaintiff, Alan Nisselson, be awarded a default judgment against the Defendant, eMarketer Inc., in a total judgment of $20,390.80. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 21,0015 (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
order
Motion, Default Judgment
Wed 03/10 5:58 PM
Order signed on 3/10/2021 Granting Motion for Default Judgment . (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/17 1:53 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Thu 02/11 11:33 AM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgement | ||
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 02/11 12:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 02/10/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 02/08 2:21 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against eMarketer Inc. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 02/04 12:27 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/03 12:06 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/19 3:23 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 06/19 3:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for June 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Motion, Approve
Thu 04/23 8:14 AM
Order Signed On 3/26/2020 Re: On Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code . (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 03/23 2:30 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/05 4:46 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc. Responses due by 3/19/2020,. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mediator List | ||
Att: 4 Notice | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/25 2:58 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 02/24 4:00 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01050 smb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13789194. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 02/19 9:21 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 3/20/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 02/18 2:49 PM
Adversary case 20-01050 Complaint against eMarketer Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |