Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04142
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2020
Terminated:Sep 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
MDK Inc., Defendant
PO Box 263 625 Klenske Ave.
New Hampton, IA 50659
Represented By
MDK Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
court Minute Entry. Case Closed Tue 03/09 10:36 AM
Minute Entry. Case Closed. Related [+] (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Monday, February 08, 2021
court Minute Entry. Matter Settled Mon 02/08 11:30 AM
Minute Entry. Matter Settled. Related [+] (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
21 21 misc Mediator's Certification Pursuant to L.B.R. 7016-2(a)(7) Tue 12/08 2:20 PM
Mediator's Certification Pursuant to L.B.R. 7016-2(a)(7) was not conducted, because the parties settled prior to the mediation Filed by Mediator Jason W Bank Related [+]. (Bank, Jason)
Related: [-] 16 Order for Mediation
Thursday, September 10, 2020
20 20 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Thu 09/10 10:30 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation
19 19 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/10 10:02 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Rivore Metals, LLC and MDK Inc. . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 09/10 10:32 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4142 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/10 10:34 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4142 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Thu 09/10 1:33 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 9/10/2020 by the United States Postal Service to Jason W. Bank at 500 Woodward Ave., Suite 2500, Detroit, MI 48226. Related [+] (sms)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Monday, August 24, 2020
18 18 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/24 4:43 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/08 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order for Mediation
Thursday, August 06, 2020
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Thu 08/06 12:23 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 8/6/2020 by the United States Postal Service to Jason W. Bank at 500 Woodward Ave., Suite 2500, Detroit, MI 48226. Related [+] (sms)
Related: [-] 16 Order for Mediation
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
16 16 order Mediation Wed 08/05 4:50 PM
Order Appointing Mediator, Jason W Bank is appointed as Mediato Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation for Mediation filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC
Monday, August 03, 2020
15 15 motion Stipulation for Mediation Mon 08/03 10:36 AM
Stipulation for Mediation By and Between Rivore Metals, LLC and MDK Inc. . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
14 14 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Fri 07/17 3:58 PM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC Related [+]. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 12 Report Parties Rule 26(f) Conference
Thursday, July 02, 2020
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/06 8:52 AM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order - Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 2/8/2021 at 10:00AM at Courtroom 1925. Trial date set for 3/9/2021 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 1925. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
12 12 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Fri 06/26 1:40 PM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
11 11 court Copy of Wed 06/10 5:18 PM
Copy of: Case Management Order Applicable To All Pending Preference Actions (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/18 1:12 PM
Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant MDK Inc. Related [+]. (Kaminski, Shanna)
Related: [-] 8 Statement of Corporate Ownership
9 9 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Mon 05/18 11:42 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 5/26/2020. (kcm)
Related: [-] 8 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Defendant MDK Inc.
Friday, May 15, 2020
8 8 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 05/15 11:11 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant MDK Inc.. (Kaminski, Shanna)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/15 10:55 AM
Answer to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Filed by MDK Inc.. (Kaminski, Shanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 04/16 4:37 PM
Stipulation By and Between Rivore Metals, LLC and MDK Inc. through their respective counsel Re: Deadline for Defendant to Answer Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
5 5 court Copy of Thu 03/19 11:44 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/18 10:05 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant MDK Inc.. (Kaminski, Shanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/03 1:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on MDK Inc. 3/3/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 03/03 12:53 PM
Summons Issued on MDK Inc. Answer Due 04/2/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/03 12:53 PM
Adversary case 20-04142 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against MDK Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]