Fauquet v. Children and Families et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Alfred V Covello |
Referred: | Thomas O Farrish |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-00335 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 08, 2020 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Peter Cantiana
|
|
Defendant
Department of Children and Families
|
|
Defendant
John Driscoll
|
|
Defendant
Priscella Hammond
|
|
Defendant
Ryan Ziowaski
|
|
Plaintiff
Kirsten Fauquet
Church 2350 Gold Star Highway
Mystic, CT 06355 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 01/21 4:40 PM
MANDATE of USCA dated 1/18/2022 Dismissing17 Notice of Appeal filed by Kirsten Fauquet (Payton, R.) |
|
Monday, July 26, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/26 8:48 AM
ORDER denying the plaintiff's18 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis based on the grounds set forth in the (doc. 13) court's order. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 07/26/2021. (Covello, Alfred) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 07/23 1:31 PM
NOTICE of USCA re: Pending Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. RE:17 Notice of Appeal filed by Kirsten Fauquet. USCA Case Number 21-1774 (Bozek, M.) |
|
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
Mon 07/12 8:32 AM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re:17 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none. (Bozek, M.) |
|
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/09 3:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kirsten Fauquet.(Bozek, M.) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 07/09 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Kirsten Fauquet. (Bozek, M.) |
|
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 05/07 11:32 AM
MANDATE of USCA dated 5/6/2021 Dismissing14 Notice of Appeal filed by Kirsten Fauquet. (Bozek, M.) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
Fri 12/11 4:26 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re:14 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none. (Bozek, M.) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 12/10 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Kirsten Fauquet.(Bozek, M.) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/05 2:27 PM
ORDER denying the plaintiffs9 motion to appeal in forma pauperis as untimely. The plaintiff filed her motion prior to the court making its de novo determination of the findings in the recommended ruling pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). Subsequent to her motion, the court adopted the recommended ruling of the magistrate judge. Even if the plaintiff were to now file a timely motion to appeal in forma pauperis, "[t]he Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal." Best v. DiTech Holding Corporation, 407 F. Supp. 3d 210, 212 (E.D.N.Y 2019) (citing Coppedge v. U.S., 369 U.S. 438, 444-445 (1962)); see also Ninying v. Fire Dept., 416 F. Supp. 3d 175, 179 (E.D.N.Y 2017); 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3)(stating that "[a]n appeal may not be taken in forma pauperis if the trial court certifies in writing that it is not taken in good faith.") "The Second Circuit has instructed the district courts that... an application for leave to appeal in forma pauperis will have sufficient substance to warrant consideration only if, in addition to an adequate showing of indigence and of citizenship, it identifies with reasonable particularity the claimed errors which will be the basis for the appeal. If these requirements are satisfied, and if on consideration the trial judge is conscientiously convinced that there is no substantial question for review and that an appeal will be futile,... or if he is convinced that there is no 'reasonable basis' for the claims of alleged error,... it is the duty of the trial judge, albeit not a pleasant duty, to certify that the appeal is not taken in good faith." Hamage v. Dzurenda, 2015 WL 1540658 at *2 (D. Conn. April 7, 2015) (citing U.S, v. Farley, 238 F.2d 575, 576 (1976)). As noted in the recommended ruling, this is the fourth action brought by the plaintiff in this court alleging a violation of her constitutional rights due to CTDCFs termination of her parental rights, all of which merited dismissal. (See 3:19-cv-00717 (MPS); 3:19-cv-00767 (MPS); and 3:19-cv-01426 (AVC)). As such, the court is convinced that "an appeal will be futile" and that "that there is no 'reasonable basis' for the claims of alleged error." Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/5/2020. (Covello, Alfred) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/02 9:35 AM
ORDER finding as moot the2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, in light of the courts order (dkt. no. 11) adopting the6 recommended ruling and dismissing the case. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/2/2020. (Sondergeld, C.) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Recommended Ruling
Fri 10/02 9:31 AM
ORDER adopting the6 recommended ruling dismissing the case, over objection. It is so ordered. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/2/2020. (Sondergeld, C.) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
Fri 09/25 8:34 AM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re:8 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none. (Agati, Kathryn) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 09/25 8:31 AM
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMAPAUPERIS/AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY BY PETITIONER/APPELLANT by Kirsten Fauquet. (Agati, Kathryn) |
|
8 | 8
appeal
Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
Fri 09/25 8:28 AM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to6 RECOMMENDED RULING Denying2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kirsten Fauquet. (Agati, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit RECOMMENDED RULING ON REVIEW UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915 | ||
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/30 2:23 PM
MOTION to Objection of Dismissional of Federal Court Case by Kirsten Fauquet. Responses due by 7/21/2020 (Agati, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 envelope | ||
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Recommended Ruling
Fri 06/19 5:59 PM
RECOMMENDED RULING recommending that the complaint be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and that2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to send a copy of the attached ruling to the plaintiff at her address of record. Objections due by 7/3/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 06/19/2020.(LaRue-Zitzkat, Sage) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/17 8:18 AM
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish for a ruling on2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/17/2020.Motion referred to Thomas O. Farrish(Bozek, M.) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
order
Electronic Filing Order
Fri 03/13 2:32 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/12/2020.(Bozek, M.) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Fri 03/13 2:31 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2020. Discovery due by 9/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2020.(Bozek, M.) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/13 2:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kirsten Fauquet. (Bozek, M.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/13 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Peter Cantiana, Department of Children and Families, John Driscoll, Priscella Hammond, Ryan Ziowaski, filed by Kirsten Fauquet.(Bozek, M.) |
|
Att: 1 envelope |