Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:C Ashley Royal
Case #: 3:20-cv-00038
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2020
Terminated:Mar 15, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Sep 13, 2020 7:09 AM EDT
Defendant
JOSEPH BRAMLETT
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
DAVID ZAJACI
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
ERIC YARBOUROUGH
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT SHUMAN
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
JESSICA SCOGGINS
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
LANCE SAVAGE
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
JOHN MURA
Represented By
DANA K MAINE
contact info
WESLEY C JACKSON
contact info
Defendant
KIRK MCLEROY
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
VICTOR MARTINEZ
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
NINA M LEE
Represented By
DANA K MAINE
contact info
WESLEY C JACKSON
contact info
Defendant
CHRIS LABOWICZ
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
MASON HENSON
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER
Represented By
BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG
contact info
Defendant
CHARLIE DALTON
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
DEPUTY CHARLES CLINE
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
SAM ASTIN
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
LAYLA H ZON
Represented By
BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG
contact info
Defendant
WALTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
ALEX STONE
Represented By
BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG
contact info
Defendant
HENRY HUFF
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
DREW ANN HUDSON
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
BRIAN GRANGER
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By
BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG
contact info
Defendant
SAM DUFF
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
JOE CHAPMAN
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL BLAKEMAN
Defendant
JERI COLLYN BLAKEMAN
Plaintiff
DAVID BRYAN CRESPO
3682 WILLOW CLUB DR
LOGANVILLE, GA 30052


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, June 02, 2022
45 45 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 06/02 12:22 PM
MANDATE of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court as to39 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
44 44 appeal USCA Order/Opinion NOT MANDATE Tue 05/03 4:14 PM
USCA Order/Opinion (AFFIRMED) as to39 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Thursday, October 28, 2021
appeal Electronic Availability of ROA Thu 10/28 10:18 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:39 Notice of Cross Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
43 43 appeal USCA Order/Opinion NOT MANDATE Tue 06/29 4:22 PM
USCA Order reinstating appeal as to39 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
42 42 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 05/25 4:34 PM
MANDATE of USCA DISMISSING appeal as to39 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO (ggs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
41 41 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 04/26 10:52 AM
USCA Case Number 21-11323 AA re39 Notice Appeal filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
40 40 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 04/14 11:00 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:37 Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Amended Motion,39 Notice of Appeal Judge Appealed: C. Ashley Royal. Court Reporter: N/A. Fee: PAID. (ggs)
Related: [-]
39 39 appeal Notice of Cross Appeal Wed 04/14 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to38 Judgment by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO. Filing fee $ 505, Manual Receipt No. 42588. (ggs) Modified on 4/14/2021 to correct docket text. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
38 38 order Judgment Mon 03/15 3:34 PM
JUDGMENT (ggs)
Related: [-]
37 37 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Amended Motion Mon 03/15 3:01 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; granting26 Motion for Leave to File Surreply as to8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, re25 Surreply; granting27 Motion for Leave to File Additional Exhibits re16 RESPONSE re8 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; granting31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying34 Motion to Strike; granting34 Motion to File Supplemental Response re31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; granting7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting8 Motion to Dismiss1 Complaint; granting10 Motion Reserving the Right to File Additional Motions; granting11 Amended Motion Amending7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting13 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Having dismissed all claims over which the Court has original jurisdiction, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE any potential state law claim. Thus, Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby DISMISSED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 03/15/21 (ans)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
36 36 respm Response to Motion Tue 08/18 2:04 PM
RESPONSE filed by NINA M LEE, JOHN MURA re34 MOTION to Strike31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to File Supplemental Response re31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (JACKSON, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/18 2:01 PM
REPLY to Response filed by NINA M LEE, JOHN MURA re31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (JACKSON, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
34 34 motion Strike Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/04 12:46 PM
MOTION to Strike31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to File Supplemental Response re31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope
33 33 respm Response to Motion Tue 08/04 12:42 PM
RESPONSE filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO re31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Excerpt of Jury Trial Transcript,
Att: 2 Investagative Reports,
Att: 3 Certified Mail Return Receipts,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 Envelope
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
32 32 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 07/22 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by WESLEY C JACKSON on behalf of NINA M LEE, JOHN MURA Attorney WESLEY C JACKSON added to party NINA M LEE(pty:dft), Attorney WESLEY C JACKSON added to party JOHN MURA(pty:dft)(JACKSON, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
31 31 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/15 2:31 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NINA M LEE, JOHN MURA filed by DANA K MAINE.(MAINE, DANA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
30 30 order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 07/08 12:35 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting24 Motion to Stay pending resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE C. ASHLEY ROYAL on 7/8/2020. (cdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 06/26 2:54 PM
REPLY to Response filed by JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, STATE OF GEORGIA, ALEX STONE, LAYLA H ZON re23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint : (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
28 28 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/12 2:00 PM
RESPONSE filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO re23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments not marked as exhibits,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Envelope
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
27 27 motion Leave to File Tue 06/09 3:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Additional Exhibits re16 RESPONSE re8 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO.(ggs) Modified on 6/9/2020 to link documents. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Excerpts from transcript of jury trial,
Att: 2 Envelope
26 26 motion Leave to File Tue 06/09 3:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply as to8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, re25 Surreply. Filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO.(ggs) Modified on 6/9/2020 to link documents. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Deficiency Notice,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, May 29, 2020
25 25 respm Surreply Related to Motion Fri 05/29 1:55 PM
SURREPLY filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO re8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint NOTE: Plaintiff did not first obtain permission to file a surreply.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments not marked as exhibits,
Att: 2 Envelope
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 05/29 2:00 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; This document is considered to be a surreply. Please refer to MDGA Local Rule 7.3.1 pertaining to subsequent briefs. A motion must be filed for permission to file a surreply.(ggs)
Related: [-] 25 Surreply (Second Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
24 24 motion Stay Tue 05/26 6:01 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery pending resolution of motion to dismiss complaint re23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint : by JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, STATE OF GEORGIA, ALEX STONE, LAYLA H ZON filed by BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG.(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Brief in support of stay of discovery pending resolution of motion to dismiss
23 23 motion Dismiss Complaint Tue 05/26 5:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint : by JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, STATE OF GEORGIA, ALEX STONE, LAYLA H ZON filed by BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG.(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Brief in support of motion to dismiss complaint
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 05/12 9:05 AM
REPLY to Response filed by SAM ASTIN, JOSEPH BRAMLETT, JOE CHAPMAN, CHARLES CLINE, CHARLIE DALTON, SAM DUFF, MASON HENSON, DREW ANN HUDSON, HENRY HUFF, CHRIS LABOWICZ, VICTOR MARTINEZ, KIRK MCLEROY, LANCE SAVAGE, JESSICA SCOGGINS, ROBERT SHUMAN, WALTON COUNTY GEORGIA, DAVID ZAJACI re8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint : (Waymire, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
21 21 misc Amended Document Mon 05/11 3:05 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO, amending the certificate of service re20 Application to Clerk of Entry of Default. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
20 20 misc Application to Clerk for Entry of Default Fri 05/08 8:25 AM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, STATE OF GEORGIA, ALEX STONE, LAYLA H ZON. (ggs)
Related: [-]
order Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 05/08 9:57 AM
Plaintiffs Request for CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, STATE OF GEORGIA, ALEX STONE, LAYLA H ZON is DECLINED - Proper service not perfected. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/05 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
18 18 misc Application to Clerk for Entry of Default Tue 05/05 2:57 PM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default and Affidavits against JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, STATE OF GEORGIA, ALEX STONE, LAYLA H ZON, WALTON COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE, et al(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
17 17 misc Application to Clerk for Entry of Default Tue 05/05 2:51 PM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, STATE OF GEORGIA, ALEX STONE, LAYLA H ZON(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Envelope
order Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 05/05 3:36 PM
Plaintiffs Requests for CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, STATE OF GEORGIA, ALEX STONE, LAYLA H ZON, WALTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, et al is DECLINED. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2020
16 16 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/28 3:37 PM
RESPONSE filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO re13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint,8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint:(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Declaration,
Att: 2 Second Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Order Setting Bond,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - ID Card,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Birth Certificate,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Rule Nisi,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - Hearing transcript 4/12/2017,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - Polygraph test,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - Hearing transcript 11/1/2017,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 - Transcript excerpts,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Tasha Howell and transcript excerpts,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10 - Investigative Memorandum,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11 - Certifice of Birth Resulting in Stillbirth,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12 - Investigative Summary,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13 - Incident Report Supplement,
Att: 16 Exhibit 14 - DNA Report,
Att: 17 Exhibit Photograph,
Att: 18 Certificate of Service,
Att: 19 Envelope
Friday, April 24, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/24 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG on behalf of JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, STATE OF GEORGIA, ALEX STONE, LAYLA H ZON Attorney BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG added to party JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER(pty:dft), Attorney BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG added to party STATE OF GEORGIA(pty:dft), Attorney BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG added to party ALEX STONE(pty:dft), Attorney BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG added to party LAYLA H ZON(pty:dft) (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/24 2:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO as to JOHN MURA. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
13 13 motion Dismiss Complaint Fri 04/17 11:47 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint : by BRIAN GRANGER, ERIC YARBOUROUGH filed by Jason C. Waymire.(Waymire, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
12 12 order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/17 9:54 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting9 Motion to Stay Discovery pending the resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motions to Amend the Complaint. Ordered by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE C. ASHLEY ROYAL on 4/17/2020. (cdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
11 11 motion AMENDED MOTION Thu 04/16 3:24 PM
AMENDED MOTION (with signature) Amending7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 13, 2020
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/13 10:47 AM
MOTION Reserving the Right to File Additional Motions Filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Envelope
9 9 motion Stay Mon 04/13 8:59 AM
JOINT MOTION to Stay discovery and related procedural requirements by SAM ASTIN, JOSEPH BRAMLETT, JOE CHAPMAN, CHARLES CLINE, CHARLIE DALTON, SAM DUFF, MASON HENSON, DREW ANN HUDSON, HENRY HUFF, CHRIS LABOWICZ, VICTOR MARTINEZ, KIRK MCLEROY, LANCE SAVAGE, JESSICA SCOGGINS, ROBERT SHUMAN, WALTON COUNTY GEORGIA, DAVID ZAJACI filed by Jason C. Waymire.(Waymire, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
8 8 motion Dismiss Complaint Mon 04/13 8:55 AM
FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint : by SAM ASTIN, JOSEPH BRAMLETT, JOE CHAPMAN, CHARLES CLINE, CHARLIE DALTON, SAM DUFF, MASON HENSON, DREW ANN HUDSON, HENRY HUFF, CHRIS LABOWICZ, VICTOR MARTINEZ, KIRK MCLEROY, LANCE SAVAGE, JESSICA SCOGGINS, ROBERT SHUMAN, WALTON COUNTY GEORGIA, DAVID ZAJACI filed by Jason C. Waymire.(Waymire, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
notice Notice Re: Filing in Proper Division Mon 04/13 10:49 AM
NOTICE RE FILING IN PROPER DIVISION: Your documents were sent to a division other than the division where your case is pending. Although not required, in order to expedite filing we recommend you send documents to the division where your case is pending. Please send all future documents to: U.S. District Court, P. O. Box 1106, Athens, Georgia 30603. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2020
7 7 motion Leave to File Fri 04/10 4:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Letter to Judge,
Att: 3 Cover Letter,
Att: 4 Envelope
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 04/10 4:07 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, every pleading, written motion and other papers must be signed by a party personally if the party is unrepresented. You must refile your signed document within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal of your case by the Court. (ggs)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Leave to File filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO
Thursday, April 09, 2020
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/09 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO as to STATE OF GEORGIA c/o Attorney General Christopher Carr.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/31 12:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO as to JOSEPH BRAMLETT, JOE CHAPMAN, CHARLES CLINE, CHARLIE DALTON, BRIAN GRANGER, MASON HENSON, DREW ANN HUDSON, CHRIS LABOWICZ, NINA M LEE, VICTOR MARTINEZ, KIRK MCLEROY, JOHN MURA, LANCE SAVAGE, JESSICA SCOGGINS, ROBERT SHUMAN, DAVID ZAJACI. (ggs) (ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/31/2020) Envelope
Monday, March 23, 2020
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/23 1:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO as to SAM ASTIN, JERI COLLYN BLAKEMAN, MICHAEL BLAKEMAN, SAM DUFF, CHIP FERGUSON, JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, HENRY HUFF, ALEX STONE, ERIC YARBOUROUGH, LAYLA H ZON. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/17 4:51 PM
Summons Issued as to SAM ASTIN, JERI COLLYN BLAKEMAN, MICHAEL BLAKEMAN, JOSEPH BRAMLETT, JOE CHAPMAN, CHARLES CLINE, CHARLIE DALTON, SAM DUFF, STATE OF GEORGIA, BRIAN GRANGER, MASON HENSON, DREW ANN HUDSON, HENRY HUFF, CHRIS LABOWICZ, NINA M LEE, VICTOR MARTINEZ, KIRK MCLEROY, JOHN MURA, JACQUELINE PAYNE, LANCE SAVAGE, JESSICA SCOGGINS, ROBERT SHUMAN, ALEX STONE, WALTON COUNTY GEORGIA, DAVID ZAJACI, LAYLA H ZON. (ggs)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent Tue 03/17 1:26 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DAVID BRYAN CRESPO (ggs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/17 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing Fee $400, Manual Receipt Number 42290, filed by DAVID BRYAN CRESPO. (ggs) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/17/2020) (ans)
Related: [-]