Original Case: 3:20-cv-00038

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-prici-11323
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2021
Terminated:May 25, 2021
Last checked: Friday May 28, 2021 4:29 AM EDT
SERVICE
Represented By
Dana Kristin Maine
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Wesley Calvin Jackson
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WALTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ERIC YARBOUROUGH, Investigator, Walton County District Attorney's Office
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID ZAJACI, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROGER SHUMAN, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JESSICA SCOGGINS, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LANCE SAVAGE, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KIRK MCLEROY, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
VICTOR MARTINEZ, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHRIS LABOWICZ, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MASON HENSON, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHARLIE DALTON, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DEPUTY CHARLES CLINE, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH BRAMLETT, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HENRY HUFF, Walton County Sheriff Department also known as BO
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SAM DUFF, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SAM ASTIN, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DREW ANN HUDSON, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JACQUELINE PAYNE FLETCHER, Assistant District Attorney, Walton County also known as JAQUELINE PAYNE
Represented By
Brian Edward Goldberg
Attorney General's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN MURA, Walton County Sheriff's Department (former)
Represented By
Dana Kristin Maine
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Wesley Calvin Jackson
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NINA M. LEE, Walton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Dana Kristin Maine
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Wesley Calvin Jackson
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOE CHAPMAN
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRIAN GRANGER
Represented By
Jason C. Waymire
Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LAYLA ZON
Represented By
Brian Edward Goldberg
Attorney General's Office
contact info
Christopher Michael Carr
Attorney General's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ALEX STONE
Represented By
Brian Edward Goldberg
Attorney General's Office
contact info
Christopher Michael Carr
Attorney General's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By
Brian Edward Goldberg
Attorney General's Office
contact info
Christopher Michael Carr
Attorney General's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID BRYAN CRESPO
Represented By
David Bryan Crespo
contact info

GPO May 03 2022
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant David Bryan Crespo. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.

Docket last updated: 05/28/2021 4:29 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant David Bryan Crespo on 04/14/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/24/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/28/2021 as to Appellant David Bryan Crespo. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/12/2021 as to Appellees BRIAN GRANGER and State of Georgia
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties
Att: 2 4 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 1 pgs Judgment, DE #38
Att: 4 15 pgs Order, DE #37