McMillian v. Zimmer US, Inc. et. al.
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:18-md-02859
Lead case: 1:18-md-02859
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-02358 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 13, 2020 8:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Zimmer Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zimmer Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zimmer US Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis McMillian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 4:11 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that no later than April 25, 2024, the parties shall file on ECF a joint letter, described below, updating the Court on the status of the case. The joint letter shall not exceed eight pages and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs: 1. A list of all member cases that remain to be litigated ("Live Cases"); 2. Whether any case other than the Live Cases that remains open can be closed (administratively or otherwise), specifically addressing the status of Sullens, which is open but has had no docket activity since July 13, 2022; 3. The status of the Master Settlement Agreement ("MSA"), including but not limited to the timing and process for dismissal of any not-yet-dismissed cases that are part of the MSA and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/12/24) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-JMF et al. (yv) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 04/12 8:38 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Paul A. Crotty is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) |