Rodney Strong v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-02454 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 1:20-cv-00263 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 09, 2020 2:22 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Rodney Strong
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 04/01 12:49 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Wed 03/18 9:56 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Wed 03/18 9:44 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern |
|
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/18 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Wed 03/18 9:50 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 41 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 3/10/2020 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:20-cv-00263-SAB from Eastern District of California (Fresno). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFMx. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-41). CASE TRANSFERRED to Central District of California. MDL 2814. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/18/2020.] | |
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re5 Civil New Case Documents,. (Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/18/2020.] | |
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, | ||
Att: 3 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 4 VDRP | ||
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Hailey Rogerson on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Rogerson, Hailey added.(Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) MDL No. 2814-AB (FFMx) by Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number 281740 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8749492)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Hailey M. Rogerson, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Notice CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 10 Proof of Service |