Wyoming Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cathleen D Parker
Case #: 2:20-bk-20111
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Jan 05, 2021
Converted:Nov 20, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mountain States Rosen LLC
920 7th Ave
Greeley, CO 80631-4106
Represented By
William Cross
Markus Williams Young & Hunsicker LLC
contact info
James T. Markus
Markus Williams Young & Hunsicker LLC
contact info
Otis & Bedingfield, LLC
contact info
Bradley T Hunsicker
Markus Williams Young & Hunsicker LLC
contact info
Markus Williams Young & Hunsicker LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Mountain States Rosen, LLC
Represented By
Frederick D Cruz
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Tucker Ellis, LLP
contact info
Brian J. Jackiw
Tucker Ellis, LLP
contact info
Thomas Richard Fawkes
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Patton & Davison, LLC
contact info
Terry Wynn Connolly
Patton & Davison
contact info
Trustee
Randy L. Royal
P.O. Box 551
Greybull, WY 82426
Trustee
Alex Smith
Alliance Management Market Square, Suite 400 1400 Sixteenth Street
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Tucker Ellis
Tucker Ellis, LLP
contact info
Terry Wynn Connolly
Patton & Davison
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
308 West 21st Street, 2nd Floor
Cheyenne, WY 82001
Represented By
Daniel J. Morse
Assistant U.S. Trustee
contact info

GPO Jul 21 2020
Memorandum Opinion for Approval of (A) Asset Purchase Agreement and Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtor's Assets; (B) Authorizing the Sale of Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Rights, Encumbrances and Other Interests Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 363(b), 363(f) and 363(m); (C) Assuming and Assigning Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 365; and (D) Granting Related Relief (related document(s):131 Generic Motion). (cxy)

Docket last updated: 07/08/2021 1:19 PM MDT
Thursday, March 19, 2020
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 03/19 1:11 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Mountain States Rosen LLC (Hunsicker, Bradley)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 03/19 1:12 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-20111 ) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2219906. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 court Corp/Ptnr Resolution Thu 03/19 1:13 PM
Corporation/Partnership Resolution Filed. Filed by Mountain States Rosen LLC (Hunsicker, Bradley)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs misc Notice Thu 03/19 1:24 PM
Notice re: LOCAL RULE 1002-1(A) LIST OF ASSETS . Filed by Mountain States Rosen LLC (Hunsicker, Bradley)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Notice of Incomplete Filing Thu 03/19 2:07 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filing and Intent to Dismiss Case. Atty Disclosure Statement due 4/2/2020. List of all creditors due 4/2/2020. Declaration concerning Debtors Schedules due 4/2/2020. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/2/2020. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/2/2020. Schedule A/B due 4/2/2020. Schedule D due 4/2/2020. Schedule E/F due 4/2/2020. Schedule G due 4/2/2020. Schedule H due 4/2/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/2/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/2/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 4/2/2020. (tsm)
Related: [-]
6 6 7 pgs motion Employ Thu 03/19 3:41 PM
Application to Employ Markus Williams Young & Hunsicker LLC as Debtor's Counsel . Filed on behalf of Mountain States Rosen LLC by Bradley T Hunsicker. (Hunsicker, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Hunsicker Declaration
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order
7 7 6 pgs motion Limit Notice Thu 03/19 4:24 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Limit Notice . Filed on behalf of Mountain States Rosen LLC by Bradley T Hunsicker. (Hunsicker, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Limited Mailing Matrix
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order
8 8 3 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 03/19 8:01 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Related [+]. Filed by Mountain States Rosen LLC (Hunsicker, Bradley)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Incomplete Filing
9 9 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Thu 03/19 8:01 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors . Filed by Mountain States Rosen LLC (Hunsicker, Bradley)
Related: [-]