Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20111

Wyoming Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cathleen D Parker
Case #: 2:22-ap-02012
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2022
Terminated:Sep 26, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Formula 1 Feeds, Inc.
4401 Wyalusing New Albany Rd.
New Albany, PA 18833
Represented By
Formula 1 Feeds, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alex G. Smith, not individually, but solely as Chapter 7 Trustee of Mountain States Rosen, LLC
Alliance Management Market Square 1400 Sixteenth Street Suite 400
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Terry Wynn Connolly
Patton & Davison
contact info
Brian J. Jackiw
Tucker Ellis, LLP
contact info
Thomas Richard Fawkes
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, September 26, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/26 11:19 AM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-2012 Closed . (tsm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 08/11 4:09 PM
Stipulation By Alex G. Smith and Formula 1 Feeds, Inc. .. Filed by Alex G. Smith (Connolly, Terry)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 30, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/30 10:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Friday, April 29, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/29 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/29/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Thursday, April 28, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 04/28 10:36 AM
Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and Accept Service Related [+]. (dxj)
Related: [-] []4 Stipulation
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
6 6 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 04/27 1:09 PM
Order Granting Admission pro hac vice for Brian J. Jackiw. $100 Filing fee is to be forwarded to CLERK US DISTRICT COURT Related [+] (tsm)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, April 25, 2022
5 5 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 04/25 9:44 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Brian J. Jackiw. . Filed by Alex G. Smith (Connolly, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Verified Statement of Brian J. Jackiw
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 04/20 10:56 AM
Stipulation By Alex G. Smith and Formula 1 Feeds, Inc. .. Filed by Alex G. Smith (Connolly, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, March 18, 2022
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 03/18 1:42 PM
Summons Issued on Formula 1 Feeds, Inc. Date Issued 3/18/2022, Answer Due 4/18/2022 . (tsm)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 03/18 1:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-02012 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2422495. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/18 1:07 PM
Adversary case 22-02012 ADVERSARY COMPLAINT - Nature of Suit (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) - by Plaintiff(s) Alex G. Smith against Defendant(s) Formula 1 Feeds, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (Jackiw, Brian)
Related: [-]