Maria Lara v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-02457 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 04, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 3:20-cv-01287 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 09, 2020 2:08 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Maria Lara
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 04/07 10:33 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 11/04 5:35 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Maria Lara.(Barry, David) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Fri 03/20 9:02 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (esa) |
|
14 | 14
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Fri 03/20 8:44 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
13 | 13 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE (CTO-41) to the Central District of California. In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation - MDL No. 2814. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Transferring case electronically to the Central District of California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | ||
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/20 8:59 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa) |
|
15 | 15
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Fri 03/20 8:52 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 41 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 3/13/20 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:20-cv-01287 JD from Northern California San Francisco. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx). (esa) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
12 | 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/26/20.(haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
10 | 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Marie Rogerson (Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
8 | 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Jeannette Mrowka(Mrowka, Molly) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Related Cases(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company, Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is HG20050412. (Filing Fee $400.00 Receipt Number 0971-14200429). Filed by Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) Modified on 2/21/2020 (mbcS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/24/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Molly J. Mrowka, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate/Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No.1 -5) by Ford Motor Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/20/2020.] |