Original Case: 3:19-cv-00250

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv.pr-01358
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2020
Terminated:Nov 16, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 17, 2021 3:33 AM EST
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL INDIAN GAMING ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL CENTER FOR AMERICAN INDIAN ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL CONGRESS OF AMERICAN INDIANS
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIVE AMERICAN FINANCE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
HABEMATOLEL POMO OF UPPER LAKE CONSUMER FINANCIAL SERVICES REGULATORY COMMISSION
Represented By
Bruce A. Finzen
ROBINS KAPLAN LLP
contact info
Timothy W. Billion
ROBINS KAPLAN LLP
contact info
Brendan Johnson
ROBINS KAPLAN LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
ASSOCIATION ON AMERICAN INDIAN AFFAIRS
Represented By
Jonodev Osceoia Chaudhuri
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Edward King Poor
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Nicole Simmons
QUARLES & BRADY, LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellant
STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By
William H. Hurd
TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP
contact info
Hector Balderas
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF NEW MEXICO
contact info
Tania Maestas
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF NEW MEXICO
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Brian C. Toth
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Teresa Ann Wallbaum
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant
SAM ICAY, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
VERONICA KROHN, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
JENNIFER BURNETT, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
CAROL MUNOZ, Secretary of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
SHERRY TREPPA, Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
AMBER JACKSON, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
AIMEE JACKSON-PENN, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
IRIS PICTON, Secretary of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
KATHLEEN TREPPA, Treasurer of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
TRACEY TREPPA, Vice-Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity
Defendant
SHERRY TREPPA, Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Counsil; in her official capacity
Defendant - Appellant
JOSHUA LANDY
Represented By
Matthew E. Price
JENNER & BLOCK, LLP
contact info
Betsy Henthorne
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Jaclyn Delligatti
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Matthew R. Skanchy
WILKINSON STEKLOFF LLP
contact info
Thomas John Perrelli
JENNER & BLOCK, LLP
contact info
Jan Amber Larson
JENNER & BLOCK, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
SCOTT ASNER
Represented By
Matthew E. Price
JENNER & BLOCK, LLP
contact info
Thomas John Perrelli
JENNER & BLOCK, LLP
contact info
Jan Amber Larson
JENNER & BLOCK, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GEORGE HENGLE
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LAWRENCE MWETHUKU, on behalf of themselves and all individuals similarly situated
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SUE COLLINS
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STEVEN PIKE
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
TIFFANI MYERS
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ELWOOD BUMBRAY
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIE ROSE
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SHERRY BLACKBURN
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
KELLY GUZZO PLC
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew W. H. Wessler
GUPTA WESSLER PLLC
contact info

GPO Nov 16 2021
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. [1001059260]. [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359]

Docket last updated: 11/17/2021 3:30 AM EST
Thursday, March 26, 2020
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. Case manager: JeffNeal. 20-1358 JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:30 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 20-161. Record complete? Yes. 20-1358 JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:33 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs FEE NOTICE issued to Jan Amber Larson, Thomas John Perrelli, Matthew E. Price - after grant of permission to appeal. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN.. 20-1358 JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:35 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. 20-1358 JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:37 AM]
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1358 20-1359 with 20-1062 Copies to all parties. [1000709884] 20-1062 20-1063 20-1358 20-1359 JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:50 AM]
Related: [-]