First River Energy, LLC v. United States of America
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-50085
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-50085
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig A Gargotta |
Case #: | 5:20-ap-05018 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
United States of America
Trial Atty., Office of the U.S. Trustee 615 E. Houston St., Room 533
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
First River Energy, LLC
Akerman LLP 2001 Ross Ave., Suite 3600
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Friday, February 12, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 02/12 12:59 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Kanyumbu, Terrance) |
||
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Thu 02/11 6:50 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by David W. Parham for Plaintiff First River Energy, LLC (Parham, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/29 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/29/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
order
AP-Abating (pdf)
Mon 04/27 10:12 AM
Agreed Order Approving (Order entered on 4/27/2020) (Esquivel, Maria) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Thu 04/23 2:34 PM
Stipulation to Abate Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff First River Energy, LLC, Defendant United States of America (Epstein, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Adversary Summons Served
Wed 04/01 5:54 PM
Summons Served on United States of America - served on 4/1/2020 (Parham, David) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (Auto)
Mon 03/30 8:23 AM
Summons Issued on United States of America Answer Due 04/29/2020 (Parham, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/30 8:23 AM
Adversary case 20-05018 Complaint filed by First River Energy, LLC (attorney David W. Parham) against United States of America (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Parham, David) |