Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-53795

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:20-ap-04180
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2020
Terminated:May 28, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Total Scrap Management, Defendant
Represented By
Total Scrap Management
contact info
Plaintiff
Rivore Metals, LLC, Plaintiff
305 Barclay Circle Suite 1003
Troy, MI 48083
Represented By
Michelle Stephenson
contact info
Ernest Hassan
Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, June 22, 2020
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/22 12:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC Related [+]. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, May 28, 2020
12 12 order Default Judgment Thu 05/28 4:21 PM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 11 Motion For Default Judgment
11 11 motion Default Judgment Thu 05/28 1:04 PM
Motion for Default Judgment with Declaration and Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 05/28 4:21 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:20-ap-4180 : Granted by Default Judgment. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/28 4:22 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-4180 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Thu 05/28 5:00 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 5/28/2020 by the United States Postal Service to; Total Scrap Management c/o Marty Pathak, Owner, 4250 North Service Rd E, Windsor, ON N8W 5X2. Related [+] (sms)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, May 18, 2020
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 05/18 10:46 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Total Scrap Management - Default Judgment Motion due by 6/1/2020. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/03 12:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC Related [+]. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Generic Motion
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/03 12:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on Total Scrap Management 4/3/2020 (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Wed 04/01 10:43 AM
Order Prescribing The Time For Service Of Response To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Served On Defendant Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 5
6 6 court Copy of Wed 04/01 10:21 AM
Copy of: Order Establishing Certain Procedures For Adversary Proceedings To Avoid And Recovery Preferential Transfers, And Vacating All Entries Of Default By The Clerk Filed To Date In Any Of The Pending Adversary Proceedings (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Wed 04/01 10:49 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 4/1/20 by the United States Postal Service to the Total Scrap Management, C/o Marty Pathak, Owner, 4250 North Service Rd E, Windsor, ON N8W 5X2 . Related [+] (kcm)
Related: [-] 7 Order
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
5 5 motion generic Motion Tue 03/31 1:11 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Prescribing the Time for Service of Response to Complaint Served on a Foreign Defendant Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7004 and 7012(a); with Proposed Order Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Withdrawal Tue 03/31 1:10 PM
Notice of Withdrawal Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC Related [+]. (Stephenson, Michelle)
Related: [-] 3 Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Prescribing the Time for Service of Response to Complaint Served on a Foreign Defendant Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7004 and 7012(a); with Proposed Order
3 3 motion generic Motion Tue 03/31 12:30 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Prescribing the Time for Service of Response to Complaint Served on a Foreign Defendant Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7004 and 7012(a); with Proposed Order Filed by Plaintiff Rivore Metals, LLC (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 03/31 12:21 PM
Summons Issued on Total Scrap Management Answer Due 04/30/2020 (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/31 12:21 PM
Adversary case 20-04180 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Rivore Metals, LLC against Total Scrap Management. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Hassan, Ernest)
Related: [-]