Patricia Begley v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-02867 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 2:20-cv-00486 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 23, 2020 1:30 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Patricia Begley
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago |
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 11/04 5:37 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Patricia Begley.(Barry, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Wed 04/01 12:54 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Tue 03/31 8:13 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern |
|
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California. ELECTRONIC RECORDS SENT. CASE CLOSED.(Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 04/01 12:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) |
|
13 | 13
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Wed 04/01 12:51 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 43 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 3/26/2020 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:20-cv-00486-KJM-DMC from Eastern District of California (Sacramento). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFMx. (ghap) Modified on 4/1/2020 (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Pine for Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 7/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at 2986 Bechelli Lane, Third Floor, Redding, California, before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Pine, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
7 | 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 7/9/2020 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED, and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Hailey Rogerson on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Rogerson, Hailey added.(Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
5 | 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) MDL No. 2814-AB-FFMx by Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tehama County Superior Court, case number 20CI000014 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8774870)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/31/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Hailey M. Rogerson, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 9 Proof of Service |