Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:20-bk-10755
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2020
Terminated:Aug 11, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Jun 26, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ravn Air Group, Inc.
4700 Old International Airport Road
Anchorage, AK 99502
Represented By
Victoria A. Guilfoyle
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


1. Ravn, Alaska's Biggest Regional Airline, Files for Bankruptcy (ttnews.com)
Submitted Tue 04/28/2020
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
963 963 claims Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135 Tue 08/30 9:41 PM
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]