Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-10755

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:20-bk-10760
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2020
Terminated:Nov 13, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Frontier Flying Service, Inc.
5245 Airport Industrial Road
Anchorage, AK 99709
Represented By
Victoria A. Guilfoyle
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Friday, November 13, 2020
9 9 order Final Decree Fri 11/13 8:17 AM
Final Decree Closing Certain Cases and Amending Caption of Remaining Case. Signed on 11/12/2020 (LCN)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 11/13 8:33 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
8 8 claims Claims Register Mon 07/20 8:53 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 05/11 11:36 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Frontier Flying Service, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Victoria)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 05/11 11:35 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities,. Filed by Frontier Flying Service, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
5 5 misc Equity Security Holders Wed 04/15 2:47 PM
Equity Security Holders // Combined List of Equity Security Holders Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(3) Filed by Frontier Flying Service, Inc.. (Tarr, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 04/08 8:30 AM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtor's Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Ravn Air Group, Inc. (3047), Ravn Air Group Holdings, LLC (5356), JJM, Inc. (4858), HoTH, Inc. (9957), Peninsula Aviation Services, Inc. (6859), Corvus Airlines, Inc. (7666), Frontier Flying Service, Inc. (8091), and Hageland Aviation Services, Inc. (2754). The docket of Ravn Air Group, Inc. in Case No. 20-10755 (BLS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 4/7/2020 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 05, 2020
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Sun 04/05 7:56 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Corvus Airlines, Inc., Frontier Flying Service, Inc., Hageland Aviation Services, Inc., HoTH, Inc., JJM, Inc., Peninsula Aviation Services, Inc., Ravn Air Group Holdings, LLC, Ravn Air Group, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Victoria)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 04/05 7:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-10760 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9710244, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 04/05 7:12 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Frontier Flying Service, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Victoria)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Sun 04/05 9:31 PM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA)
Related: [-]