New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:20-cv-02849
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2020
Terminated:Sep 23, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2020 5:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Montefiore Medical Center
Represented By
Nina Massen
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Jean L. Schmidt
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Jennette Wohlar
Represented By
Nina Massen
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Jean L. Schmidt
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lourdes Matias
Represented By
Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Ballon, Stoll, Bader And Nadler
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, July 07, 2023
47 47 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 07/07 4:20 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to46 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lourdes Matias. USCA Case Number 22-2812 Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/07/2023..(nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 10/24 9:23 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:46 Notice of Appeal.(tp)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File Mon 10/24 9:24 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for46 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lourdes Matias were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
46 46 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 10/21 5:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from44 Memorandum & Opinion,45 Clerk's Judgment,. Document filed by Lourdes Matias. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26853817. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
45 45 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 09/23 3:44 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:44 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar against Lourdes Matias. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion dated September 23, 2022, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/23/2022) (tp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Package
44 44 32 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Fri 09/23 12:01 PM
OPINION re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Jennette Wohlar, Montefiore Medical Center. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. 33 and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/23/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
43 43 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 11/19 2:56 PM
DECLARATION of Jennette Wohlars in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Field, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
42 42 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 11/19 2:56 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Field, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
41 41 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/22 10:15 PM
DECLARATION of Marshall B. Bellovin, Esq. in Opposition re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19
40 40 misc Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 Fri 10/22 9:55 PM
COUNTER STATEMENT TO34 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
39 39 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/22 9:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
38 38 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 10/08 5:48 PM
DECLARATION of Jean L. Schmidt in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Schmidt, Jean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
37 37 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 10/08 5:43 PM
DECLARATION of Georgia Colquhoun-Pryce in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Field, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
36 36 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 10/08 5:43 PM
DECLARATION of Jennette Wohlars in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Field, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q
35 35 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 10/08 5:34 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Field, Joseph)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Rule 56.1 Statement Fri 10/08 5:32 PM
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Field, Joseph)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/08 5:31 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Field, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Fri 09/24 10:16 AM
ORDER granting31 MOTION to Withdraw9 Notice of Appearance of Nina Massen . Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Nina Massen as counsel for Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/24/2021) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
31 31 motion Withdraw Thu 09/23 11:34 AM
MOTION to Withdraw9 Notice of Appearance of Nina Massen . Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Massen, Nina)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 09/21 8:40 AM
ORDER granting29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due October 8, 2021. Plaintiffs' opposition, if any, is due November 5, 2021. Defendants' reply is due November 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 10/8/2021. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/20/2021) (tg)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time Mon 09/20 5:43 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph E. Field dated September 20, 2021. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Field, Joseph)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/20 5:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Eric Field on behalf of Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Field, Joseph)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 09/21 8:41 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/5/2021 Replies due by 11/19/2021. (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
26 26 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/16 6:26 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:25 Pre-Conference Statement filed by Lourdes Matias. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The fact discovery deadline is extended to July 29, 2021. The pretrial conference scheduled for July 23, 2021 is adjourned to July 30, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The parties must appear for the conference by dialing (888) 363-4749, using the access code 3121171 and the security code 2849. SO ORDERED., ( Fact Discovery due by 7/29/2021., Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/16/2021) (ama)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Pre-Conference Statement Fri 07/16 11:49 AM
PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT . Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
24 24 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/14 12:21 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:23 Pre-Conference Statement filed by Jennette Wohlar, Montefiore Medical Center. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part. The plaintiff shall provide HIPAA-compliant medical records release authorizations to the defendant no later than close of business on June 15, 2021. The fact discovery deadline is extended to July 19, 2021. The pretrial conference is adjourned to July 23, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The parties must appear for the conference by dialing (888) 363-4749, using the access code 3121171 and the security code 2849. The parties' joint letter is due by July 15, 2021. SO ORDERED., ( Fact Discovery due by 7/19/2021., Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/14/2021) (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
23 23 misc Pre-Conference Statement Fri 06/11 3:57 PM
PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT Pursuant to Dkt. 21 . Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Massen, Nina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/05 12:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Monika Karolina Olowska on behalf of Lourdes Matias..(Olowska, Monika)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/12 4:51 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLANAND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Expert Deposition due by 8/2/2021. Fact Discovery due by 6/18/2021. Expert Discovery due by 8/2/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/12/2021) (ks)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Memo Endorsement 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 03/12 4:47 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:17 Status Report filed by Lourdes Matias. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 19, 2021 is canceled. A case Management plan will be entered separately. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/12/2021) (js)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Fri 03/12 1:51 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Prager, Sholom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/11 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sholom Jacob Prager on behalf of Lourdes Matias..(Prager, Sholom)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Status Report Thu 03/11 3:22 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
16 16 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 02/23 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on March 19, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 2849. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter as outlined below. In their joint letter, the parties should indicate whether they believe a Rule 16 conference is unnecessary and ask that their proposed Case Management Plan simply be so ordered; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and have no objection to proceeding by teleconference; or whether they believe a conference would be helpful and request it be adjourned until such time as it can be safely held in person. If the parties prefer an in-person conference, they should propose three mutually-agreed upon Fridays for the conference, although the Court does not guarantee it will honor the parties' preferred date. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by March 11, 2021, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/19/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/23/2021) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
minutes Mediation Conference Thu 01/14 1:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 1/14/2021. Mediation Status due by 2/16/2021. (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Thu 12/17 10:31 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 1/14/2021 at 10:00 AM by video conference..(sb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Wed 11/04 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 12/4/2020..(rpr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
14 14 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Fri 10/23 10:24 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/2/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
14 14 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Fri 10/23 10:24 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/2/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/13 11:37 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Schmidt, Jean)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/13 11:35 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Montefiore Health System, Inc. for Montefiore Medical Center. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center..(Schmidt, Jean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
11 11 order Stipulation and Order Tue 08/18 10:53 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the respective parties, that Defendants Montefiore Medical Center's and Jennette Wohlars's (incorrectly identified in the caption as Wohlar) time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action shall be extended up to and including Tuesday, October 13, 2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/18/2020) (nb)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 08/18 9:46 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Schmidt, Jean)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/18 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nina Massen on behalf of Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Massen, Nina)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/18 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jean L. Schmidt on behalf of Montefiore Medical Center, Jennette Wohlar..(Schmidt, Jean)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/18 10:54 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Montefiore Medical Center answer due 10/13/2020; Jennette Wohlar answer due 10/13/2020. (nb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 07/20 1:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Montefiore Medical Center served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. Service was accepted by Jessie Suriel. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 04/24 10:06 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennette Wohlar..(pne)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 04/24 10:05 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Montefiore Medical Center..(pne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/23 1:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Montefiore Medical Center, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/23 12:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jennette Wohlar, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 04/07 10:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marshall Benjamin Bellovin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs); Dollar Demand $9,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 445 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,000,000;. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/07 10:52 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/07 10:53 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/07 10:53 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2020
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/06 4:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/06 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Montefiore Medical Center, Jeanette Wohlar. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19346472)Document filed by Lourdes Matias..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit