Original Case: 1:20-cv-02849

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-02812
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2022
Terminated:Jun 23, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jun 29, 2023 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Montefiore Medical Center
Represented By
Jean L. Schmidt
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Eric Field
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jennette Wohlar
Represented By
Jean L. Schmidt
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Eric Field
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lourdes Matias
Represented By
Lourdes Matias
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/29/2023 4:44 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lourdes Matias, FILED. [3412965] 22-2812 [Entered: 11/02/2022 04:47 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/23/2022, RECEIVED.[3412976] 22-2812 [Entered: 11/02/2022 04:52 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/23/2022, RECEIVED.[3412978] 22-2812 [Entered: 11/02/2022 04:53 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Lourdes Matias, USCA receipt # ANYSDC26853817, FILED.[3412979] 22-2812 [Entered: 11/02/2022 04:55 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3412980] 22-2812 [Entered: 11/02/2022 04:56 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 8 pgs