Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:20-cv-01456
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2020
Terminated:Feb 04, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2020 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Kari A. Powell
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info
Conor P. Desmond
Doj-Tax
contact info
Plaintiff
Marie U. Beug-Deeb
Represented By
Josie Harris-Walton
Deming, Parker, Hoffman, Campbell & Daly, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Deeb
Represented By
Josie Harris-Walton
Deming, Parker, Hoffman, Campbell & Daly, LLC
contact info

GPO Feb 04 2022
OPINION & ORDER: The United States' Motion for Summary Judgment 29 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/4/2022. (jra)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 27, 2022
42 42 appeal USCA Order Fri 05/27 3:11 PM
USCA Order DISMISSING for lack of jurisdiction re:38 Notice of Appeal, filed by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-11203 JJ. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
41 41 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Mon 04/18 4:19 PM
USCA Acknowledgment of38 Notice of Appeal, filed by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-11203 JJ. (pjm)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Certified Mon 04/18 4:21 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,38 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-11203 JJ. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
40 40 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 04/12 9:01 AM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Clerk's Judgment, Order and Opinion, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:38 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
Related: [-]
39 39 appeal USCA Appeal Transmission Tue 04/12 8:57 AM
USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re:38 Notice of Appeal filed by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb. (kac)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
38 38 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 04/11 6:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to37 Clerk's Judgment by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-11723888. Transcript Order Form due on 4/25/2022 (Harris-Walton, Josie)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
37 37 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 02/07 8:52 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action.(jra)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
36 36 22 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 02/07 8:49 AM
OPINION & ORDER: The United States' Motion for Summary Judgment29 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/4/2022. (jra)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 02/07 8:56 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/07 9:05 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Judge Clarence Cooper no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-1456-TWT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (cmd)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 09/07 9:12 AM
Submission of29 MOTION for Summary Judgment to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
35 35 respm Response (Non-Motion) Mon 04/12 12:44 PM
RESPONSE re31 Reply to Response to Motion Related [+] filed by United States of America. (Desmond, Conor)
Related: [-] ply to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts contained ECF 31, pages 7-9
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/12 12:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. (Desmond, Conor)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 04/09 9:12 AM
Submission of29 MOTION for Summary Judgment , to District Judge Clarence Cooper. (jta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
utility Docket Correction Tue 03/30 9:56 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re31 Reply to Response to Motion. Incorrect event used. The Clerk has made the necessary corrections. (jta)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
33 33 respm Response to Statement of Material Facts Mon 03/29 9:39 PM
Response to Statement of Material Facts re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration filed by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb. (Harris-Walton, Josie)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Response to Statement of Material Facts Mon 03/29 6:55 PM
Response to Statement of Material Facts re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb.(Harris-Walton, Josie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit J,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit L,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit M,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit N,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit O,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit I
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/29 6:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb. (Harris-Walton, Josie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/10 9:58 AM
ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (mmc) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
29 29 motion Summary Judgment Mon 03/08 5:50 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by United States of America.(Desmond, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Material Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit
Thursday, January 28, 2021
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/28 10:58 AM
TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (mmc) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Relief from Order/Judgment Wed 01/20 11:43 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Relief from Local Rule 56.1. Accordingly, the Court extends the time for filing of motions for summary judgment to thirty days after the settlement conference scheduled in this case, or March 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 1/20/2021. (jta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
26 26 motion Relief from Order/Judgment Tue 01/19 10:19 PM
Joint MOTION for Relief from10 Scheduling Order with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Desmond, Conor)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
notice Notice of Video/Telephone Proceeding Fri 01/15 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING by docket text only : Settlement Conference RESET for 2/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Clarence Cooper. (Please see Order [Doc.#22] for Settlement Instructions) Connection Instructions: Velma Shanks is inviting you to a scheduled ZoomGov meeting. Topic: Settlement Conference 20-cv-1456 Time: Feb 22, 2021 10:00 AM Eastern Time. Meeting ID: 161 548 8231 Passcode: 615597. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available[LINK:here] . The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available[LINK:here] . Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (vs) Modified on 1/15/2021 (vs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Relief from Order/Judgment Thu 01/14 4:03 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Partial Relief from Local Rule 16.7(I)(1). Accordingly, the Court will allow the Department of Justice Trial Attorney assigned to this casewith authority to negotiate and recommend a settlement to the appropriate officialto attend the settlement conference alone with his Section Chief available for consultation by telephone, if needed. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 1/14/2021. (jta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
24 24 motion Relief from Order/Judgment Tue 01/12 2:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Relief from22 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings as to attendance requirement by representative with full settlement authority with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Desmond, Conor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Wed 01/06 3:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb.(Harris-Walton, Josie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
22 22 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/04 3:45 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. (Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 10:00 AM via Zoom platform Courtroom before Judge Clarence Cooper.) Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 1/4/2021. (jta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/09 8:50 AM
NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
20 20 discov Certificate of Service Thu 10/08 5:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb.(Harris-Walton, Josie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/29 11:29 AM
EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Tue 09/08 5:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of United States' first set of requests for production of documents and interrogatories by United States of America.(Desmond, Conor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/02 8:34 AM
SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/01 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Conor P. Desmond on behalf of United States of America (Desmond, Conor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/04 9:23 AM
SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (jpa) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/13 10:14 AM
FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (ddm) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Tue 07/07 2:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the United States' Initial Disclosures by United States of America.(Powell, Kari)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
12 12 discov Initial Disclosures Mon 07/06 8:29 PM
First Initial Disclosures by Marie U. Beug-Deeb, Thomas M. Deeb.(Harris-Walton, Josie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix A
Thursday, July 02, 2020
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/02 8:18 AM
FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/25 11:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan The case shall proceed on an Six (6) Month Discovery Track and Discovery shall commence on July 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 6/25/2020. (jta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
9 9 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 06/24 5:24 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by United States of America. (Powell, Kari)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/04 2:02 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by United States of America. Discovery ends on 11/2/2020.(Powell, Kari)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/27 8:56 AM
THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/04 2:42 PM
SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2020
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/09 10:47 AM
Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/30/2020. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2020
4 4 4 pgs order Order Mon 04/06 4:13 PM
GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 04/06 3:55 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney General-Washington, D.C.. (eop)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 04/06 3:53 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney Office -Atlanta. (eop)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/06 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Thomas M. Deeb and Marie U. Beug-Deeb. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9564246)(eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet