Raul Rodriguez v. Ford Motor Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-03398 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2021 |
Case in other court: | California Southern, 3:20-cv-00380 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 10, 2020 2:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 20
|
|
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raul Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 11/17 11:39 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Tue 04/14 1:25 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 04/14 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car) |
|
11 | 11
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Tue 04/14 1:22 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-44 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 4/13/20 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:20-cv-00380-WQH-JLB from U.S. District Court Southern District of California (San Diego). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFMx. (car) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Mon 04/13 4:06 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern |
|
9 | 9
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Mon 04/13 2:44 PM
Case transferred to District of Central District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California*. (jdt) |
|
Att: 1 MDL 2814 CTO-44 | ||
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER Granting in Part Defendant's7 Ex Parte Motion to Continue. A Joint Discovery Plan is due by 4/27/2020. A telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are reset for 5/7/2020 at 1:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/31/2020. (ag) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/13/2020.] | |
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Related Dates by Ford Motor Company.(Schuler, Ian) (ag). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER CONVERTING EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES TO TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES AND ISSUING UPDATED PROCEDURES re ECF5 . Counsel and parties or client representatives with full settlement authorityfor each party must be immediately available by telephone between the hours of9:00 AM and 12:00 PM on April 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/19/2020.(sjm) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/13/2020.] | |
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 4/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE Conference, a Case Management Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is SET for 4/8/2020, and will be held at the conclusion of the ENE Conference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due by 3/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/2/2020.(ag) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/13/2020.] | |
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (sjt) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/13/2020.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates for Ford Motor Company. (smd) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/13/2020.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Ford Motor Company of case(s) MDL No. 2814-AB (FFMx). (smd) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/13/2020.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2020 00002141-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13537512.), filed by Ford Motor Company. The new case number is 3:20-cv-380-WQH-JLB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 35 pgs Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 10 Declaration |