Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Katherine M Perhach
Case #: 2:20-bk-22839
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Oct 07, 2020
Claims Deadline:Nov 06, 2020
Converted:Jul 15, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Engstrom, Inc.
PO Box 40
Two Rivers, WI 54241-0040
Represented By
Eliza M. Reyes
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
contact info
Paul G. Swanson
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
contact info
Debtor
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
107 Church Ave. PO Box 617
Oshkosh, WI 54903
Represented By
Paul G. Swanson
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
contact info
Last checked: Monday Aug 02, 2021 1:15 PM CDT
Accountant
Bero Group, LLC
N16 W23217 Stone Ridge Drive
Waukesha, WI 53188
Accountant
Martin J. Cowie
6152 Island View Drive
Oshkosh, WI 54901
Accountant
Michael Benton Hawkins Ash
Represented By
Douglas F. Mann
contact info
Accountant
Hawkins Ash CPA's, LLP
1249 W. Liebau Rd., Suite 200
Mequon, WI 53092
Auctioneer
Sweeney's Auction Associates, Inc.
Tim Sweeney 801 West Fond du Lac Street PO Box 418
Ripon, WI 54971
Creditor
Canfield Funding LLC (d/b/a Millennium Funding)
Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren s.c. 1000 North Water Street, Suite 1700
Milwaukee, WI 53202
Represented By
Frank W. DiCastri
Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren S.C.
contact info
Sara McNamara
Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren S.C.
contact info
Creditor
LSQ Funding Group, L.C.
315 E Robinson St, Suite 200
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
Rachel M. Blise
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Max Steven Meckstroth
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Wronski
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Spec. Counsel
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
107 Church Ave. PO Box 617
Oshkosh, WI 54903
Trustee
Douglas F. Mann
740 North Plankinton Avenue Suite 736
Milwaukee, WI 53203
Represented By
Paul G. Swanson
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
contact info
David E Morrison
Goldberg Kohn Ltd
contact info
Goldberg Kohn LTD.
contact info
Douglas F. Mann
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
517 East Wisconsin Ave. Room 430
Milwaukee, WI 53202
Represented By
Michelle S. Y. Cramer
U.S. Trustee
contact info
Witness
Cherie Campion
Kravit, Hovel & Krawczyk s.c. 825 North Jefferson Street, Suite 500
Milwaukee, WI 53202
Represented By
Stephen E. Kravit
Kravit, Hovel & Krawczyk, S.C.
contact info
Brian Thomas Fahl
Kravit Hovel & Krawczyk S.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Trustee
Andrew N. Herbach
Terminated: 07/23/2020
1800 E. Howard Ave
Milwaukee, WI 53207


Docket last updated: 02/18/2025 9:03 AM CST
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
1 1 31 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11) Wed 04/15 11:39 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Engstrom, Inc. Fee Amount: $1717. (Swanson, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 04/15 11:40 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-22839 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19335123. Fee amount 1717.00 Related [+] . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 court Case Assigned Wed 04/15 11:49 AM
Judge Katherine M. Perhach added to case. (ljr, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 8 pgs motion Employ Wed 04/15 12:03 PM
Application to Employ Steinhilber Swanson LLP as Counsel to the Debtor with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service filed by Paul G. Swanson of Steinhilber Swanson LLP on behalf of Debtor Engstrom, Inc.. Objections due by 4/29/2020. (Swanson, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 7 pgs motion Employ Wed 04/15 12:46 PM
Application to Employ Martin J. Cowie as Accountant for the Estate with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service filed by Paul G. Swanson of Steinhilber Swanson LLP on behalf of Debtor Engstrom, Inc.. Objections due by 4/29/2020. (Swanson, Paul)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 04/16 7:43 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Paul G. Swanson on behalf of Engstrom, Inc. . (jam, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Equity Security Holders Thu 04/16 7:44 AM
List of Equity Security Holders filed by Paul G. Swanson on behalf of Engstrom, Inc. . (jam, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]