Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-22839

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Katherine M Perhach
Case #: 2:21-ap-02019
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2021
Terminated:Sep 17, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cherie Campion
E5379 Golf Drive
Kewaunee, WI 54216
Represented By
Cherie Campion
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas F. Mann, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Engstrom, Inc.
740 N. Plankinton Ave., Suite 210
Milwaukee, WI 53203
Represented By
Paul G. Swanson
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Thursday, December 12, 2024
22 22 court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 12/12 5:10 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by Mann. Receipt Number 70000927. (admin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 19, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/19 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 09/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Stipulation
Friday, September 17, 2021
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/17 2:50 PM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-2019 Closed (jam, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 09/17 2:35 PM
Order Dismissing Case Related [+]. (jam, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 09/17/2021)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation,1 Complaint
18 18 1 pgs misc Proposed Order Fri 09/17 12:34 PM
Proposed Order (Agreed to by the Parties) RE:17 - Stipulation filed by Attorney Paul G. Swanson of Steinhilber Swanson LLP on behalf of Douglas F. Mann. (Swanson, Paul)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Stipulation Fri 09/17 12:33 PM
Stipulation By Douglas F. Mann and Cherie Campion to Dismiss Case filed by Paul G. Swanson on behalf of Douglas F. Mann. (Swanson, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
16 16 utility Chambers Docket Notice Wed 09/15 5:09 PM
Adjourned Pretrial Conference held 9/14/2021. Peter Nowak appeared for the Plaintiff and Brian Fahl appeared for the Defendant. The Plaintiff intends to file a stipulation and proposed order dismissing the adversary proceeding without prejudice because the underlying bankruptcy case is on appeal. Mr. Nowak intends to file the Stipulation and proposed Order on or before 09/17/2021. An audio recording of the hearing is available on the docket. (jah, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs audio Upload Audio File Tue 09/14 1:27 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/14/2021 12:07:24 PM ]. File Size [ 1052 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:11 ]. (Adjourned Pretrial Conference). (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
14 14 court Hearing Continued (KMP) Tue 08/31 11:56 AM
Notice to counsel: The adjourned pretrial conference scheduled for 8/31/2021 has been continued to 9/14/2021 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone . To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-675-2535, and enter access code 9918878 before the scheduled hearing time. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
13 13 court Hearing Continued (Adv Other) Fri 07/30 4:03 PM
Adjourned pretrial conference held 7/27/2021. Paul Swanson and Peter Nowak appeared for the Plaintiff, and Brian Fahl appeared for the Defendant. The parties agreed to adjourn this pretrial conference pending the Court's decision on LSQ's Motion for Summary Judgment in Douglas F. Mann, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Engstrom, Inc. v. LSQ Funding Group, LC. , Case No. 20-2062 kmp. The adjourned pretrial conference is scheduled for 8/31/2021 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-675-2535, and enter access code 9918878 before the scheduled hearing time. An audio recording of the hearing is available on the docket. (jaz, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs audio Upload Audio File Tue 07/27 12:16 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 07/27/2021 12:07:14 PM ]. File Size [ 2064 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:18 ]. (Adjourned Pretrial Conference). (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
11 11 1 pgs misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 07/22 10:38 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for Brian T. Fahl filed by Cherie Campion. (Fahl, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Adv Other) Thu 06/17 1:54 PM
The Adjourned Pretrial Conference scheduled for 06/22/2021 is adjourned to 07/27/2021 at 12:00 PM by telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-675-2535, and enter access code 9918878 before the scheduled hearing time (jaz, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
9 9 misc Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/20 8:33 AM
Notice of Change of Address for Defendant Cherie Campion Filed by Cherie Campion (Kravit, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/03 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 04/02/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice of Hearing (Chambers KMP) Wed 03/31 11:51 AM
Notice of Adjourned Pretrial Conference. Hearing to be held on 6/22/2021 at 12:00 PM by telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-675-2535, and enter access code 9918878 before the scheduled hearing time. (jaz, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Adv Other) Wed 03/31 11:49 AM
Pretrial conference held 3/30/2021. Paul Swanson and Peter Nowak appeared for the Plaintiff, and Benjamin Glicksman appeared for the Defendant. The parties agreed to adjourn this pretrial conference pending the Court's decision on LSQ's Motion for Summary Judgment in Douglas F. Mann, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Engstrom, Inc. v. LSQ Funding Group, LC. , Case No. 20-2062 kmp. The adjourned pretrial conference is scheduled for 6/22/2021 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-675-2535, and enter access code 9918878 before the scheduled hearing time. The Court will provide notice of the adjourned pretrial conference. An audio recording of the hearing is available on the docket. (jaz, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs audio Upload Audio File Tue 03/30 1:17 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 03/30/2021 12:22:48 PM ]. File Size [ 2167 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:31 ]. (Pre-Trial Conference). (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
4 4 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/19 9:23 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Cherie Campion. (Kravit, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/16 3:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Cherie Campion 2/16/2021 (Swanson, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Electronic Summons Issued Tue 02/16 2:25 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 3/18/2021. United States and its officers and agencies answer due by 3/23/2021. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/11 3:33 PM
Adversary case 21-02019 Complaint by Douglas F. Mann (attorney Paul G. Swanson) against Cherie Campion. Receipt Number deferred, Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))(Swanson, Paul)
Related: [-]