Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:20-bk-41455
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Jan 15, 2021
Claims Deadline:May 06, 2021
Converted:Oct 19, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Yuma Energy, Inc.
Eldon B. Mahon U.S. Courthouse 501 W. 10th St.
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
Melissa S. Hayward
Hayward PLLC
contact info
Dorsey & Whitney, LLP
contact info
Lisa A. Powell
Fisherb
contact info
Zachery Z. Annable
Hayward PLLC
contact info
Rachel Stoian
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Joseph Acosta
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Lindsey Lee Robin
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
FisherBroyles, LLP
Highland Park Place
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Philip Guy Eisenberg
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Simon Richard Mayer
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Omer F. Kuebel, III
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Trustee
Laurie Dahl Rea
777 Main Street, Suite 1550
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
John Hardy Rogers
Cavazos Hendricks Poirot, P.C.
contact info
Laurie D. Rea
Forshey & Prostok, LLP
contact info
Emily S. Wall
Cavazos Hendricks Poirot, P.C.
contact info
Charles Brackett Hendricks
Cavazos Hendricks Poirot, P.C.
contact info
Laurie Dahl Rea
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
Elizabeth Ziegler Young
U.S. Trustee Office
contact info


1. Yuma Energy, Inc. Files for Chapter 11 Protection (finance.yahoo.com)
Submitted Thu 04/16/2020
Docket last updated: 12/26/2024 12:35 PM CST
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
crditcrd none Wed 04/15 10:34 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sell 20-41455 11) [motion,msell] ( 181.00). Receipt number 27666514, amount $ 181.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#6
1 1 20 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Wed 04/15 7:58 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Yuma Energy, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs motion Joint administration Wed 04/15 8:52 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 20-41453 20-41454 20-41456 Emergency Motion Filed by Debtor Yuma Energy, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion First day motions Wed 04/15 9:04 PM
Motion to establish procedures Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Cases. Filed by Debtor Yuma Energy, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion First day motions Wed 04/15 9:21 PM
Motion to maintain bank accounts. Filed by Debtor Yuma Energy, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion First day motions Wed 04/15 9:52 PM
Motion regarding utilities. Filed by Debtor Yuma Energy, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-]
6 6 73 pgs motion Sell Wed 04/15 10:27 PM
Motion to sell property free and clear of liens under Section 363(f) Emergency Motion Fee amount $181, Filed by Debtor Yuma Energy, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-]
7 7 23 pgs motion Cash collateral Wed 04/15 10:32 PM
Motion to use cash collateral Emergency Motion Filed by Debtor Yuma Energy, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extend/Shorten time Wed 04/15 10:41 PM
Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor Yuma Energy, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Employ Wed 04/15 11:08 PM
Application to employ Stretto as Claims Agent Stretto Filed by Debtor Yuma Energy, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-]