Yuma Exploration and Production Company, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-41455
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-41455
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mark X Mullin |
Case #: | 4:20-bk-41456 |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2020 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 10, 2020 |
Converted: | Oct 19, 2020 |
Dismissed: | Oct 30, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Yuma Exploration and Production Company, Inc.
Eldon B. Mahon U.S. Courthouse 501 W. 10th St.
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Laurie Dahl Rea
777 Main Street, Suite 1550
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202 |
Docket last updated: 12/26/2024 12:37 PM CST |
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/15 8:08 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 20-41456 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 27666434, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Yuma Exploration and Production Company, Inc. (Acosta, H) |