CONSOL Energy Inc. v. Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John E Hoffman Jr |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-02036 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 18, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al.
46226 National Road
St. Clairsville, OH 43950 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CONSOL Energy Inc.
1000 Consol Energy Drive
Canonsburg, PA 15317 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 14 2020
Opinion and Order Granting in part Denying in part Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Related Doc 6) (2be) |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 18, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 10/18 10:52 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2036 Closed (kam) |
||
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Dismissal (AP)
Tue 09/20 5:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc.. (Steege, Catherine) |
|
Tuesday, October 27, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
court
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Tue 10/27 7:46 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of the Confirmation hearing held on 8/31/20 has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period (2km) |
|
36 | 36
court
Transcript
Tue 10/27 7:45 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 8/31/20 RE: Confirmation. TRANSCRIPT IS RESTRICTED UNTIL 1/25/2021. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/3/2020. Redaction Request Due By 11/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/27/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/25/2021. (2km) |
|
35 | 35
court
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Tue 10/27 7:41 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of the Confirmation hearing held on 8/28/20 has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period (2km) |
|
34 | 34
court
Transcript
Tue 10/27 7:41 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 8/28/20 RE: Confirmation. TRANSCRIPT IS RESTRICTED UNTIL 1/25/2021. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/3/2020. Redaction Request Due By 11/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/27/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/25/2021. (2km) |
|
33 | 33
court
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Tue 10/27 7:39 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of the Confirmation hearing held on 8/27/20 has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period (2km) |
|
32 | 32
court
Transcript
Tue 10/27 7:38 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 8/27/20 RE: Confirmation. TRANSCRIPT IS RESTRICTED UNTIL 1/25/2021. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/3/2020. Redaction Request Due By 11/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/27/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/25/2021. (2km) |
|
31 | 31
court
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Tue 10/27 7:36 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of the Confirmation hearing held on 8/26/20 has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period (2km) |
|
30 | 30
court
Transcript
Tue 10/27 7:35 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 8/26/20 RE: Confirmation. TRANSCRIPT IS RESTRICTED UNTIL 1/25/2021. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/3/2020. Redaction Request Due By 11/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/27/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/25/2021. (2km) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Submission of Transcript for Court Review
Mon 10/26 4:15 PM
Submission of Transcript for Court Review. This document is not available for public view. (Eppler, Marc) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Submission of Transcript for Court Review
Mon 10/26 4:14 PM
Submission of Transcript for Court Review. This document is not available for public view. (Eppler, Marc) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Submission of Transcript for Court Review
Mon 10/26 4:13 PM
Submission of Transcript for Court Review. This document is not available for public view. (Eppler, Marc) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Submission of Transcript for Court Review
Mon 10/26 4:12 PM
Submission of Transcript for Court Review. This document is not available for public view. (Eppler, Marc) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/25 12:14 PM
Certificate of Service of Nathan Chien Regarding Debtors' Objection to CONSOL's Motion for an Expedited Hearing on its Summary Judgment Motion or in the Alternative for Language Preserving CONSOL's Real Property Rights as Part of any Sale or Confirmation Order Filed by Other Professional Prime Clerk LLC . (^Malo, David) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Objection
Thu 08/20 8:18 AM
Objection to Debtors' Objection to CONSOL's Motion for an Expedited Hearing on its Summary Judgment Motion or in the Alternative for Language Preserving CONSOL's Real Property Rights as Part of any Sale or Confirmation Order Filed by Defendant Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al. (Lewis, Kim) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Expediting Hearing
Mon 08/17 9:38 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing - Motion For An Expedited Hearing On Its Summary Judgment Motion Or In The Alternative For Language Preserving CONSOL's Real Property Rights As Part Of Any Sale Or Confirmation Order Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc. (Steege, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 08/17 9:33 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment on Count II of the Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc. (Steege, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Generic Motion
Tue 08/11 6:07 PM
Motion for Entry of a Rule 54(b) Final Judgment on Counts I, III, And IV of its Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc. (Steege, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/05 8:14 PM
Certificate of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding Answer of Defendant Murray Energy Holdings Co., et al., to Count II to the Amended Adversary Complaint Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc. Filed by Other Professional Prime Clerk LLC . (^Malo, David) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/28 11:43 PM
Answer to Complaint Answer of Defendant Murray Energy Holdings Co., Et Al., to Count II to the Amended Adversary Complaint Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc. Filed by Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al.. (Lewis, Kim) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Fri 07/17 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 07/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 07/14 4:30 PM
Opinion and Order Granting in part Denying in part Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (2be) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/18 5:46 PM
Certificate of Service of Nathan Chien Regarding Debtors' Reply to CONSOL Energy Inc.'s Objection to the Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Adversary Complaint Filed by Other Professional Prime Clerk LLC . (^Malo, David) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Reply to Response/Objection
Fri 06/12 7:10 PM
Reply to Debtors' Reply to CONSOL Energy Inc.'s Objection to the Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Adversary Complaint Filed by Defendant Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al. (Lewis, Kim) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/08 4:27 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc. . (Steege, Catherine) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Objection
Fri 06/05 6:19 PM
Objection to Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc. (Steege, Catherine) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/01 11:02 PM
Certificate of Service of Brian Li Regarding Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Adversary Complaint of CONSOL Energy Inc., Support Document Exhibit 7 Proposed Order to Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Adversary Complaint of CONSOL Energy Inc. and Support Document Revised Exhibit 6 Klar Declaration to Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Adversary Complaint of CONSOL Energy Inc. Filed by Other Professional Prime Clerk LLC . (^Malo, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 05/27 12:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Melissa Root Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc.. (Root, Melissa) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 05/27 11:51 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Catherine L. Steege Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc.. (Steege, Catherine) |
|
Saturday, May 23, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Support Document
Sat 05/23 1:17 PM
Support Document Revised Exhibit 6 Klar Declaration to Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Adversary Complaint of CONSOL Energy Inc. Filed by Defendant Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al. . (Lewis, Kim) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Support Document
Sat 05/23 12:00 AM
Support Document Exhibit 7 Proposed Order to Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Adversary Complaint of CONSOL Energy Inc. Filed by Defendant Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al. . (Lewis, Kim) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Support Document
Fri 05/22 11:58 PM
Support Document Exhibit 6 Klar Declaration to Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Adversary Complaint of CONSOL Energy Inc. Filed by Defendant Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al. . (Lewis, Kim) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/22 11:28 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Adversary Complaint of CONSOL Energy Inc. Filed by Defendant Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al. (Lewis, Kim) |
|
Att: 1 Contract Tracker | ||
Att: 2 CCC Mid-Allegheny Lease | ||
Att: 3 Closing Land Letter Agreement | ||
Att: 4 Closing Letter Agreement | ||
Att: 5 Coal Purchase and Sale Agreement | ||
Att: 6 Klar Declaration | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 05/08 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff CONSOL Energy Inc. . (Richardson, John) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 05/07 3:31 PM
Amended Complaint by John J Richardson on behalf of CONSOL Energy Inc. against Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al.. . (Richardson, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit S | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit T | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit U | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit V | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit W | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit X | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Y | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Z | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit AA | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit BB | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit CC | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit DD | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit EE | ||
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 04/24 8:52 AM
Summons Service Executed on Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al. 4/24/2020 (Richardson, John) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons Issued
Wed 04/22 4:25 PM
Summons Issued on Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al. Date Issued 4/22/2020, Answer Due 05/22/2020 (Burkley, Kirk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/22 4:19 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-02036. (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by CONSOL Energy Inc. against Murray Energy Holdings, Co., et al.. Fee Amount $350 (Burkley, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit S | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit T | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit U | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit V | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit W | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit X | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Y | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Z |