Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11358

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:20-ap-01077
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Sep 25, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
LD Film Library, LLC
Represented By
LD Film Library, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DRIVETRAIN, LLC, as Trustee of the Relativity Liquidating Trust
Robins Kaplan LLP 2049 CENTURY PARK E STE 3400
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Scott F. Gautier
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, September 25, 2020
13 13 order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 09/25 3:50 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 9/25/2020 dismissing adversary proceeding with prejudice. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation Fri 09/25 1:08 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Filed by Scott F. Gautier on behalf of DRIVETRAIN, LLC. (Gautier, Scott)
Related: [-]
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/25 3:51 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1077 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/23 4:28 PM
Scheduling Order signed on 7/23/2020. Final pre-trial conference to be held on 1/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW). (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
10 10 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 07/08 8:39 AM
Second So Ordered Stipulation and Order signed on 7/8/2020 extending the time of LD Film Library, LLC to respond to the complaint to August 2, 2020 Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
9 9 misc Stipulation Tue 07/07 3:33 PM
Stipulation and Order Extending the Time of LD Film Library LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Scott F. Gautier on behalf of DRIVETRAIN, LLC. (Gautier, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
8 8 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/16 11:38 PM
Affidavit of Service of Asir U. Ashraf Regarding Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for June 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m Related [+] filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Malo, David)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, June 11, 2020
7 7 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 06/11 1:01 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for June 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Scott F. Gautier on behalf of DRIVETRAIN, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/28/2020 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Gautier, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
6 6 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/09 8:17 PM
Affidavit of Service of James Mapplethorpe Regarding Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Time of Cast & Crew Payroll, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Time of LD Film Library, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+] Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, June 04, 2020
5 5 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 06/04 11:27 AM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 6/4/2020 extending defendant's time to respond to the complaint to July 2, 2020 Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 06/03 6:26 PM
Stipulation and Order Extending the Time of LD Film Library, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Scott F. Gautier on behalf of DRIVETRAIN, LLC. (Gautier, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
3 3 other Certificate, Service Thu 04/30 11:31 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons Related [+] filed by Scott F. Gautier on behalf of DRIVETRAIN, LLC. (Gautier, Scott)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Friday, April 24, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 04/24 1:45 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 5/26/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 04/23 10:35 PM
Adversary case 20-01077 Complaint against LD Film Library, LLC Complaint for: (I) Avoidance of Preferential Transfers; (II) Recovery of Avoided Transfers; and (III) Disallowance of Claims (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Scott F. Gautier on behalf of Relativity Liquidating Trust. (Gautier, Scott)
Related: [-]