Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02045
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Jan 25, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Celan TV Recyclers Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, December 16, 2022
40 40 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 12/16 11:22 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of39 Assignment of Judgment [DMC-1] (rlos)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Assignment of Judgment Fri 12/16 11:21 AM
Assignment of Judgment by Kimberly J. Husted (rlos)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/25 10:20 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2045 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
38 38 misc Matter Held * Thu 01/21 6:40 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02045 by Kimberly J. Husted against Celan TV Recyclers Inc.. (Fee Not Paid 350.00) (eFilingID: 6752341) (smis) Modified on 4/23/2020 (smis). (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
37 37 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 01/08 9:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
36 36 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 01/07 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
35 35 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 01/06 3:20 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (hlum)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
34 34 order Default Judgment (Sua sponte) Wed 01/06 3:19 PM
Order Granting28 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] (hlum)
Related: [-]
33 33 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 01/05 1:17 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,28 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1],29 Declaration,30 Exhibit(s) (fdis)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 01/05 12:52 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Hearing/Conference/Trial Tue 01/05 12:51 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Status Conference Re:1 Complaint to be held on 1/20/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
30 30 related Exhibit(s) Tue 01/05 8:54 AM
Exhibit(s) in support of29 Declaration [DMC-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
29 29 related Declaration Tue 01/05 8:52 AM
Declaration of Christopher D. Sullivan in support of28 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Default Judgment - Including Amended Motion Tue 01/05 8:49 AM
Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 05, 2020
27 27 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 12/05 9:13 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
26 26 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 12/03 1:41 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Entry of Default & Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures Thu 12/03 1:39 PM
Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures. Entry of Default of Defendant Celan TV Recyclers Inc. Request for entry of default judgment due by 1/4/2021. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
24 24 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 12/01 10:54 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,23 Request for Entry of Default (fdis)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Request for Entry of Default Tue 12/01 10:52 AM
Request for Entry of Default of Celan TV Recyclers Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
22 22 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 11/20 8:38 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
21 21 misc Matter Continued * Thu 11/19 3:37 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02045 by Kimberly J. Husted against Celan TV Recyclers Inc.. (Fee Not Paid 350.00) (eFilingID: 6752341) (smis) Modified on 4/23/2020 (smis).; Status Conference now to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
20 20 reports Status Report Tue 11/03 1:01 PM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
19 19 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Thu 10/08 3:54 PM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
18 18 misc Reissued Summons Fri 10/02 3:01 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 11/17/20 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tsef)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Fri 10/02 3:03 PM
Reissued Summons requested by Christopher D. Sullivan, Attorney for Plaintiff (tsef)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
17 17 misc Court's Certificate of Mailing (via USPS) (Produces Form) Fri 09/25 3:59 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing of15 Memorandum Re: Default Papers (fdis)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 09/25 3:43 PM
ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR - NO IMAGE AVAILABLE BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis) Modified on 9/25/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs misc Memorandum Re: Default Papers Fri 09/25 3:40 PM
Memorandum Re:13 Request for Entry of Default (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
14 14 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 09/24 7:51 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,13 Request for Entry of Default (fdis)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Request for Entry of Default Thu 09/24 7:49 AM
Request for Entry of Default of Celan TV Recyclers Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
12 12 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 10:04 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
11 11 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 8:28 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02045 by Kimberly J. Husted against Celan TV Recyclers Inc.. (Fee Not Paid 350.00) (eFilingID: 6752341) (smis) Modified on 4/23/2020 (smis).; Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
10 10 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:01:39 AM ]. File Size [ 821 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:25 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:29 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:38 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:06 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 1:47 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 04/23 1:46 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 04/23 1:46 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/23 1:45 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/23 1:44 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 04/23 1:44 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02045 by Kimberly J. Husted against Celan TV Recyclers Inc.. (Fee Not Paid 350.00) (eFilingID: 6752341) (smis) Modified on 4/23/2020 (smis)
Related: [-]