California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:18-bk-22453
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Mar 01, 2019
Claims Deadline:Jan 09, 2019
Converted:Oct 02, 2018
Terminated:Mar 27, 2023
Discharge Objection Deadline:Jul 30, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ECS Refining, Inc.
2222 S Sinclair Ave
Stockton, CA 95215-7551
Represented By
Christopher H. Bayley
contact info
Steven D. Jerome
contact info
Michael Bryan Reynolds
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
W. Donald Gieseke
18124 Wedge Pkwy #518
Reno, NV 89511
Represented By
Paul J. Pascuzzi
contact info
Thomas A. Willoughby
contact info
Trustee
Michael D. McGranahan
PO Box 5018
Modesto, CA 95352
Represented By
Kevin R. Bonsignore
contact info
Daniel L. Egan
contact info
Trustee
Kimberly J. Husted
11230 Gold Express Dr #310-411
Gold River, CA 95670
Represented By
Aaron A. Avery
contact info
Howard S. Nevins
contact info
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814
U.S. Trustee
Tracy Hope Davis
501 I Street, Suite 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814
Represented By
Jason M. Blumberg
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By
Gregory S. Powell
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/28/2023 3:21 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (11) Tue 04/24 9:38 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,717.00, Receipt Number: 339956, eFilingID: 6265904) (auto)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Manual Override (txt and pdf are not the same) Tue 04/24 11:38 AM
The data contained in the debtor txt file does not match the information in the voluntary petition PDF file submitted to the court in this case. Counsel is hereby advised that the clerk's office has opened the case using the information provided in the voluntary petition PDF file Re:1 Voluntary Petition (ltas)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - 11 Tue 04/24 9:31 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Missing Document(s): Statement of Financial Affairs; Attorney Disclosure Statement; Summary of Assets and Liabilities; Schedule A/B - Real and Personal Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors;Schedule E/F - Unsecured Claims; Schedule G - Exec. Contracts & Unexpired Leases; Schedule H - Codebtors; List of Equity Security Holders; Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor; Document(s) due by 5/8/2018. (Fee Paid $1717.00) (eFilingID: 6265904) (ltas)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case Tue 04/24 9:32 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. (ltas)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Master Address List Tue 04/24 9:32 AM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Employ - Including Amended Motion Tue 04/24 9:39 AM
Motion/Application to Employ Michael B. Reynolds as Attorney(s) [MBR-1] Filed by Debtor ECS Refining, Inc. (ltas)
Related: [-]
5 5 related Declaration Tue 04/24 9:43 AM
Declaration of Jack Rockwood in support of4 Motion/Application to Employ Michael B. Reynolds as Attorney(s) [MBR-1] (ltas)
Related: [-]
6 6 related Declaration Tue 04/24 9:44 AM
Declaration of Michael B. Reynolds in support of4 Motion/Application to Employ Michael B. Reynolds as Attorney(s) [MBR-1] (ltas)
Related: [-]
7 7 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 04/24 9:45 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,4 Motion/Application to Employ Michael B. Reynolds as Attorney(s) [MBR-1],6 Declaration (ltas)
Related: [-]
8 8 related Declaration Tue 04/24 9:45 AM
ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR - NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Declaration of Michael B. Reynolds in support of4 Motion/Application to Employ Michael B. Reynolds as Attorney(s) (smis) Modified on 4/24/2018 (smis)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Employ - Including Amended Motion Tue 04/24 9:46 AM
Motion/Application to Employ MCA Financial Group, Ltd. as Financial Adviser(s) [MBR-2] Filed by Debtor ECS Refining, Inc. (ltas)
Related: [-]
10 10 related Declaration Tue 04/24 9:47 AM
Declaration of Jack Rockwood in support of9 Motion/Application to Employ MCA Financial Group, Ltd. as Financial Adviser(s) [MBR-2] (ltas)
Related: [-]
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 04/24 9:47 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,9 Motion/Application to Employ MCA Financial Group, Ltd. as Financial Adviser(s) [MBR-2] (ltas)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Generic Motion/Application - Including Amended Motion Tue 04/24 9:50 AM
Motion/Application to Obtain Post-Petition Financing [MBR-3] Filed by Debtor ECS Refining, Inc. (ltas)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Cash Collateral (Use) - Including Amended Motion Tue 04/24 9:52 AM
Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [MBR-3] Filed by Debtor ECS Refining, Inc. (ltas)
Related: [-]
13 13 24 pgs related Declaration Tue 04/24 9:56 AM
Declaration of Jack Rockwood in support of12 Motion/Application to Obtain Post-Petition Financing [MBR-3],12 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [MBR-3] (ltas)
Related: [-]
14 14 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 04/24 9:57 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,12 Motion/Application to Obtain Post-Petition Financing [MBR-3],12 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [MBR-3] (ltas)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Adequate Protection - Including Amended Motion Tue 04/24 9:58 AM
Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [MBR-4] Filed by Debtor ECS Refining, Inc. (ltas)
Related: [-]
16 16 related Declaration Tue 04/24 9:58 AM
Declaration of Jack Rockwood in support of15 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [MBR-4] (ltas)
Related: [-]
17 17 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 04/24 9:59 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,15 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [MBR-4] (ltas)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Admission to Practice pro hac vice - Including Amended Motion Tue 04/24 2:46 PM
Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice by Steven D. Jerome (smis)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Admission to Practice pro hac vice - Including Amended Motion Tue 04/24 2:53 PM
Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice by Christopher H. Bayley (smis)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Admission to Practice pro hac vice - Including Amended Motion Tue 04/24 2:56 PM
Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice by Steven D. Jerome (DUPLICATE) (smis)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Admission to Practice pro hac vice - Including Amended Motion Tue 04/24 2:58 PM
Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice by Christopher H. Bayley (DUPLICATE) (smis)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Shorten Time - Including Amended Motion Wed 04/25 8:31 AM
Motion/Application to Shorten Time [MBR-1] Filed by Debtor ECS Refining, Inc. (smis)
Related: [-]
23 23 related Notice of Hearing Wed 04/25 8:35 AM
Notice of Hearing Re:4 Motion/Application to Employ Michael B. Reynolds as Attorney(s) [MBR-1] to be held on 4/26/2018 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (smis)
Related: [-]
24 24 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 04/25 8:36 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of22 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [MBR-1],23 Notice of Hearing [MBR-1] (smis)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Shorten Time - Including Amended Motion Wed 04/25 8:37 AM
Motion/Application to Shorten Time [MBR-2] Filed by Debtor ECS Refining, Inc. (smis)
Related: [-]
26 26 related Notice of Hearing Wed 04/25 8:39 AM
Notice of Hearing Re:9 Motion/Application to Employ MCA Financial Group, Ltd. as Financial Adviser(s) [MBR-2] to be held on 4/26/2018 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (smis)
Related: [-]
27 27 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 04/25 8:40 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of25 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [MBR-2],26 Notice of Hearing [MBR-2] (smis)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Shorten Time - Including Amended Motion Wed 04/25 8:41 AM
Motion/Application to Shorten Time [MRB-3] Filed by Debtor ECS Refining, Inc. (smis)
Related: [-]
29 29 related Notice of Hearing Wed 04/25 8:42 AM
Notice of Hearing Re:12 Motion/Application to Obtain Post-Petition Financing [MBR-3],12 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [MBR-3] to be held on 4/26/2018 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (smis)
Related: [-]
30 30 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 04/25 8:43 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of28 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [MRB-3],29 Notice of Hearing [MBR-3] (smis)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Shorten Time - Including Amended Motion Wed 04/25 8:43 AM
Motion/Application to Shorten Time [MRB-4] Filed by Debtor ECS Refining, Inc. (smis)
Related: [-]
32 32 related Notice of Hearing Wed 04/25 8:45 AM
Notice of Hearing Re:15 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [MBR-4] to be held on 4/26/2018 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (smis)
Related: [-]
33 33 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 04/25 8:45 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of31 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [MRB-4],32 Notice of Hearing [MBR-4] (smis)
Related: [-]